Global Patent Index - EP 1004249 A2

EP 1004249 A2 2000-05-31 - Device for the practical use of working gloves of quick fitting and removal type

Title (en)

Device for the practical use of working gloves of quick fitting and removal type

Title (de)

Hilfsvorrichtung zum anziehen und ausziehen von handschuhen

Title (fr)

Dispositif facilitant l'insertion et l'enlèvement des gants de travail

Publication

EP 1004249 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99122841 A

Priority

IT MI980760 U

Abstract (en)

The device facilitates the practical use of working gloves which need to be of easy fitting and removal, and comprises at least one glove. This latter is provided with means for facilitating the insertion and withdrawal of the hand. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41D 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 19/00 (2006.01); A47G 25/90 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 25/904 (2013.01); A41D 19/0055 (2013.01); A41D 19/0093 (2013.01); A41D 19/01 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004249 A2 20000531; EP 1004249 A3 20000816; EP 1004249 B1 20020130; AT 212511 T 20020215; DE 69900838 D1 20020314; DE 69900838 T2 20020822; DK 1004249 T3 20020408; ES 2170568 T3 20020801; IT 244393 Y1 20020311; IT MI980760 U1 20000524

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171130

2018-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171130

2018-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20171117

2018-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 212511 T

- Effective date: 20171117

2018-07-04 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20171201

2018-07-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2018-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161117

2018-02-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20171121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171129

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20171201

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-02-28 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20180104

2018-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20171128

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171123

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-11-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161117

2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161114

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20161114

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-02-29 [REG CH PCOW] CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER(S)

- Free text: DIRODAL S.R.L;VIA SAN GIOVANNI IN FIORE 45;91026 MAZARA DAL VALLO (IT)

2007-07-20 [REG FR D3] DECISION TO REVOKE THE DECISION OF LAPSE

2006-11-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060731

2003-06-01 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030601

2003-01-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-11-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-17 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021117

2002-09-06 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020401418

2002-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2170568 T3

2002-07-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-04-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-08 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2002-03-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-03-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69900838 20020314

2002-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020130

2002-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 212511 T 20020215

2002-01-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BUSCAINO, ROSA FRANCESCA

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-16 [DIN1] INVENTOR (DELETED)

2001-08-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIRODAL S.R.L

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010514

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001209

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 41D 19/00 A, 7A 47G 25/90 B, 7A 41D 19/01 B

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI