Global patent index - EP 1004256 A1

EP 1004256 A1 2000-05-31 - Height adjustable table arrangement

Title (en)

Height adjustable table arrangement

Title (de)

Höhenverstellbare Tischanordnung

Title (fr)

Agencement de table réglable en hauteur

Publication

EP 1004256 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99122648 A

Priority

DE 29821190 U

Abstract (en)

At least one vertical, tubular, guide piece (19) fixed to the table top (14) or to a frame (15) supporting the table top moves along a vertical guide bar (21) to the top of which a holder-cable (22) is fixed. The cable runs vertically down from the top of the guide bar, is deflected underneath the table top by a first deflector roller or wheel (24) and from there is guided as far as a second deflector roller or wheel (25) under the tabletop near the height adjustable table pedestal (12). The cable runs vertically downwards from the second deflector element and is fixed at a point whose level is inalterable.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine höhenverstellbare Tischanordnung, insbesondere ein Anbautisch an einem höhenverstellbaren Tisch vorgeschlagen, die eine Tischplatte und wenigstens einen höhenverstellbaren Fuß besitzt. Wenigstens ein vertikales, mit der Tischplatte ( 14) oder einem die Tischplatte (14) tragenden Rahmen (15) fest verbundenes Führungsstück (19) ist entlang einer vertikalen Führungsstange (21) verschiebbar geführt. Ein am oberen Bereich der Führungsstange (21) fixiertes Halteseil (22) verläuft von dort aus vertikal nach unten und wird mittels eines ersten Umlenkelements (24) unterhalb der Tischplatte (14) umgelenkt und dort bis zu einem zweiten Umlenkelement (25) geführt, das unterhalb der Tischplatte (14) im Bereich eines höhenverstellbaren Tischfußes (12) angeordnet ist. Dabei verläuft das Halteseil (22) von dem zweiten Umlenkelement (25) aus im wesentlichen vertikal nach unten und ist an einer in ihrer Höhe unveränderlichen Stelle fixiert. Dadurch ist eine einfache Höhenverstellung bei hoher Belastbarkeit möglich. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 9/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 9/12 (2006.01); A47B 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 17/02 (2013.01); A47B 9/12 (2013.01); A47B 2200/0002 (2013.01); A47B 2220/0077 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 29614295 U1 19960926 - BRAUN GERHARD [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DK LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29821190 U1 19990121; EP 1004256 A1 20000531

INPADOC legal status

2002-12-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020601

2001-03-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DK LI NL SE

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000522

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DK LI NL SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI