Global patent index - EP 1004261 A2

EP 1004261 A2 2000-05-31 - Squarer for frames

Title (en)

Squarer for frames

Title (de)

Winkelstück für rammen

Title (fr)

Equerre pour encadrements

Publication

EP 1004261 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99500174 A

Priority

ES 9802478 U

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a squarer for frames, comprised of a square (1) or triangle, made of metal plate and presenting corresponding extensions from the external rim of the cathetus, oriented in the same direction. Said extensions being formed by folding the corresponding side edge at right angles to the plane of the square or triangle, and being provided with passing holes (4) for screws (10) fixing on the frame. The sides of the square (1) or triangle are similarly extended from the internal and external edges at right angles by lappets (2,3,5,6) oriented respectively in opposite directions; and pressed-on for forming longitudinal flutes (7), acting as stiffening and reinforcing members. The vertex (11) of the right angle of the square (1) or triangle is externally cut or beveled at 45 DEG .

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 21/00 (2006.01); E04G 21/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 21/003 (2013.01); E04G 21/1841 (2013.01); E04B 2001/405 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004261 A2 20000531; EP 1004261 A3 20000614; ES 1041429 U 19990701; ES 1041429 Y 19991201

INPADOC legal status

2003-10-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030401

2001-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001128

2000-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: RAMOS LOPEZ, MAXIMO

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 47G 1/00 A, 7E 04G 21/18 B, 7E 04F 21/00 B

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI