Global Patent Index - EP 1004266 A1

EP 1004266 A1 2000-05-31 - Dishwasher provided with a preheating cycle

Title (en)

Dishwasher provided with a preheating cycle

Title (de)

Grschirrspüler mit Vorwärmungszyklus

Title (fr)

Lave-vaisselle avec cycle de préchauffage

Publication

EP 1004266 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99830669 A

Priority

IT MI982305 A

Abstract (en)

A dishwasher includes a washing pump (P) connected to the sprinklers (U, L) through delivery ducts (C1, C2), the water reaching the pump (P) through a supply duct (C3) coming from the collecting chamber (R), a heater (H1) to heat the water, a sensor (S) to detect the temperature thereof and valves (V1, V2) on the ducts (C1, C2) to interrupt the water delivery from the pump (P) to the sprinklers (U, L), as well as a recirculation duct (F) connecting the pump (P) to the collecting chamber (R). In this way it is possible to carry out the pre-heating of the water by circulating it only between the pump (P) and the chamber (R), with a lower consumption of water and electric power and greater comfort for the user upon loading of the dishwasher. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/4219 (2013.01); A47L 15/4285 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004266 A1 20000531; EP 1004266 B1 20021218; DE 69904559 D1 20030130; DE 69904559 T2 20031120; ES 2190639 T3 20030801; IT 1303258 B1 20001106; IT MI982305 A1 20000429; IT MI982305 D0 19981028

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20041026

2005-08-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-15 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041025

2005-05-31 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2004-10-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041026

2004-10-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041026

2004-10-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041025

2003-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031031

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-10-20 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20031020

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-10-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031017

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-10-01 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20031001

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-09-26 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030926

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2190639 T3

2003-07-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-25 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69904559 20030130

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69904559 P 20030130

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2002-12-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020502

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB SE

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000617

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI