Global patent index - EP 1004336 A1

EP 1004336 A1 2000-05-31 - Device for storing a pair of skis

Title (en)

Device for storing a pair of skis

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Lagerung eines Paar Skier

Title (fr)

Dispositif de rangement d'une paire de skis

Publication

EP 1004336 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99410167 A

Priority

FR 9814917 A

Abstract (en)

The ski storage device comprises an individual retaining element (14) composed of a fixed jaw and a movable jaw (18) connected together by articulated rods constituting a deformable parallelogram. The movable jaw is fitted with an activating pedal (34) having a stop plate (36) and a U-shaped fixing yoke (38) is mounted around the movable jaw. The yoke is connected to the stop plate by an extension (52) intended to maintain a vertical movement with the lower part of the movable jaw. A spring (50) is fastened to a spindle (56) passing with a play through a hole in the movable jaw so as to allow, when the jaws are brought together, a low amplitude pivoting movement of the activating pedal around the spindle.

Abstract (fr)

Un dispositif de rangement d'une paire de skis comprend un élément individuel de retenue 14 composé d'une mâchoire fixe et d'une mâchoire mobile 18 reliées entre elles par une paire de biellettes articulées constituant un parallélogramme déformable. La mâchoire mobile 18 est équipée d'une pédale d'actionnement 34 ayant une plaque de butée 36, et un étrier 38 de fixation en U enfourchant la partie inférieure de la mâchoire mobile 18. L'étrier 38 est relié à la plaque de butée 36 par une extension 52 destinée à maintenir un décalage vertical avec la partie inférieure de la mâchoire mobile 18. Un ressort 50 est accrochée à un axe 56 traversant avec jeu un trou 46 de la mâchoire mobile 18 pour autoriser dans la position rapprochée, un mouvement de pivotement de faible amplitude de la pédale d'actionnement 34 autour de l'axe 56. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 11/028 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

FR 2442061 A1 19800620 - AVOCAT MARCEL

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004336 A1 20000531; FR 2786079 A1 20000526; FR 2786079 B1 20010223

INPADOC legal status

2004-10-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040423

2001-03-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010115

2001-03-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES IT LI

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES IT LI

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI