Global Patent Index - EP 1004352 A1

EP 1004352 A1 2000-05-31 - Method and apparatus for mixing aqueous liquids

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for mixing aqueous liquids

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Mischen von wasserhaltigen Flüssigkeiten

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de brassage d'un fluide contenant de l'eau

Publication

EP 1004352 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98420213 A

Priority

  • EP 98420213 A
  • CA 2255403 A
  • FR 9706830 A

Abstract (en)

An aqueous liquid is mixed by circulating through a tube (1) coiled in a figure of eight shape. The coiled tube (1) is made of copper and is positioned between two ionising plates (2 and 3) made of a mineral material containing fossilised organic material. The plates are positioned parallel with the long axis of the figure of eight. The coils may be in a single stack or split into several small stacks adjacent to each other so they fit into a confined space.

Abstract (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de brassage d'un fluide contenant de l'eau, caractérisé en ce qu'il consiste à faire circuler ledit liquide selon une trajectoire formée d'une pluralité de boucles en huit. Le dispositif comprend un tube (1) conformé en une pluralité de boucles (1c) en huit superposées. Applications au traitement de l'eau potable, à l'accélération de la fermentation d'un jus de fruit ou à l'homogénéisation d'un carburant. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 5/0646 (2013.01); B01F 5/0647 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES GB IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2763868 A1 19981204; FR 2763868 B1 19990820; CA 2255403 A1 20000602; EP 1004352 A1 20000531

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020601

2001-03-21 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: ENUNIVERS

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES GB IE IT LI NL SE

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001129

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES GB IE IT LI NL SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI