Global Patent Index - EP 1004371 A1

EP 1004371 A1 2000-05-31 - Apparatus for carrying out mechanical joints

Title (en)

Apparatus for carrying out mechanical joints

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum mechanischen Fügen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour réaliser des joints mécaniques

Publication

EP 1004371 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99122191 A

Priority

DE 19853553 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19853553C1] Apparatus for stamping/pressing sheet metal has a hydraulic or pneumatic drive for the die. At the same time a control ram is operated by pneumatic or hydraulic pressure to press a grip to hold the sheet metal during pressing and while the die is retracted. The grip replaces a conventional spring grip which is prone to ageing. The grip also ensures that the sheet metal does not stick to the die, e.g. when pressing aluminum

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zum mechanischen Fügen von flächig aufeinanderliegenden Blechen mit einem Werkzeugsatz aus mindestens einem Stempel (2) und einer Matrize, die einen Hohlraum begrenzt, in den hinein gefügt wird, wobei der Stempel (2) Blechmaterial aus einer Blechebene herausverlagert und staucht, und dazu mindestens ein Werkzeugteil an einem verfahrbaren Werkzeugträger (6) angeordnet ist, der einen benachbart zu dem Werkzeugteil federvorgespannt abgestützten Niederhalter (1) aufweist. Damit der Niederhalter (1) hohe Standmengen erlaubt, ist vorgesehen, daß zur Federvorspannung des Niederhalters (1) der Werkzeugträger (6) einen Zylinderhohlraum (8) aufweist, in dem ein am Niederhalter (1) angreifender Kolben (4) geführt ist, der kopfseitig eine mit einem fluiden Druckmittel beaufschlagbare Druckkammer (5) volumenveränderbar begrenzt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 39/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 39/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 39/03 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53709 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19853553 C1 20000210; EP 1004371 A1 20000531; JP 2000153326 A 20000606; PL 336617 A1 20000522; US 6286193 B1 20010911

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-23 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030527

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030516

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000627

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI