Global Patent Index - EP 1004402 A2

EP 1004402 A2 2000-05-31 - Single-handed operating clamp

Title (en)

Single-handed operating clamp

Title (de)

Einhändig betätigbare Spannzwinge

Title (fr)

Serre-joint actionné avec une seule main

Publication

EP 1004402 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99122540 A

Priority

  • DE 29821110 U
  • US 42271499 A

Abstract (en)

The unit has a handle (2) and a drive housing (1) having a fixed clamp jaw (3). An activation handle (6) is provided which moved a rail (4) connected to the other clamp jaw (5). The rail is locked in position by means of a releasable locking member (7) which can be released by exerting a thumb onto a release member. The release member forms an activation arm (8) which sits on a pivot axis projecting out of the side of the housing.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine einhändig betätigbare Spannzwinge, mit einen einen Handgriff (2) und eine feste Spannbacke (3) aufweisenden Antriebsgehäuse (1), mit einer durch Schwenkbetätigung auf den Handgriff (2) zu eine Schiene (4) mit zweiter Backe (5) verlagerbaren Betätigungshandhabe (6), wobei die Schiene (4) mittels eines durch Daumendruck auf ein Freigabeorgan freigebbaren Sperrgliedes (7) rückdrückgesperrt ist. Zur besseren Handhabung ist vorgesehen, daß das Freigabeorgan einen um eine etwa auf Höhe der Betätigungshandhabe (2) seitlich aus dem Gehäuse (1) ragenden Schwenkachse (2) sitzenden Betätigungsarm (8) ausbildet, dessen Schwenkachse (9) bezogen auf die Spannrichtung (S) der Schiene (4) vor der Schwenkachse (10) der Handhabe (2) angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/068 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29821110 U1 20000406; EP 1004402 A2 20000531; EP 1004402 A3 20021016; US 6254073 B1 20010703

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030417

2003-08-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI