Global patent index - EP 1004405 A2

EP 1004405 A2 2000-05-31 - Extractor with quick adjusting spindle

Title (en)

Extractor with quick adjusting spindle

Title (de)

Abzieher mit schnellverstellbarer Druckspindel

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'extraction avec broche à actionnement rapide

Publication

EP 1004405 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99122541 A

Priority

DE 29821143 U

Abstract (en)

The gear puller has a pressing spindle screwed into a traverse (1), with a pressing piece (12) to press against a component hooked by claws (2) on the traverse. A rod (3) in the cavity of a threaded bush (4) on the outer thread (6) of the spindle, carries the pressing piece on one end and a rotary driver (13) on the other. The rod can be switched from a freely movable quick-fitting setting to an axially fixed torque setting by turning it in the pressing-out direction.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Abzieher mit in ein Innengewinde (11) einer Traverse (1) eingeschraubter Druckspindel, die einendseitig ein Druckstück (12) aufweist zum Ansetzen an einem aus einem ersten, durch von der Traverse ausgehende Klauen (2) widergelagerten Bauteil durch Verlagerung des Druckstückes (12) in Achsrichtung bei Spindeldrehbetätigung auszudrückenden zweiten Bauteil. Um das Ansitzen des Abziehers zu verbessern ist eine in der Höhlung (21) einer das Außengewinde (6) der Druckspindel ausbildenden Gewindehülse (4) angeordnete, einendig das Druckstück (12) und anderendig ein Drehantriebsorgan (13) tragende Stange (3) vorgesehen, die aus einer in Achsrichtung frei verschiebbaren Schnellansetzstellung durch Drehung in Ausdrückdrehrichtung mit der Gewindehülse (4) in eine axial festgelegte Drehmitnahmestellung kuppelbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 27/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 27/02 (2006.01); B25B 27/073 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 27/023 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29821143 U1 19990225; EP 1004405 A2 20000531; EP 1004405 A3 20021023

INPADOC legal status

2004-01-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030424

2003-08-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-07-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI