Global Patent Index - EP 1004455 A3

EP 1004455 A3 2000-06-14 - Sleeve of thermally formable materials and method for its production

Title (en)

Sleeve of thermally formable materials and method for its production

Title (de)

Hülse aus thermisch verformbaren Materialien sowie Verfahren zu deren Herstellung

Title (fr)

Manchon en matériau formable thermiquement et procédé pour sa production

Publication

EP 1004455 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99108084 A

Priority

DE 19854735 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1004455A2] A sleeve (1) made of a thermally deformable material, used for example in the printing industry, consists of a tubular base member with a cylindrical outer circumference. The latter has a constant radius and a cylindrical inner diameter which reduces conically in the axial direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41N 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/08 (2006.01); B41F 27/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41N 6/00 (2013.01); B41F 13/08 (2013.01); B41F 27/105 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004455 A2 20000531; EP 1004455 A3 20000614; AT 238914 T 20030515; AU 1857100 A 20000619; DE 19854735 A1 20000531; DE 19854735 B4 20091203; EP 1144200 A1 20011017; EP 1144200 B1 20030502; WO 0032409 A1 20000608

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-24 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20010822

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001202

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI