Global Patent Index - EP 1004458 A1

EP 1004458 A1 2000-05-31 - Device for closing envelope flaps

Title (en)

Device for closing envelope flaps

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Verschliessen von Briefklappen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fermeture de rabats d'enveloppes

Publication

EP 1004458 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402905 A

Priority

FR 9814757 A

Abstract (en)

A mail processing machine with a franking module, a transporting system (320, 322) with upper and lower guide plates (324, 326) and a feed module, incorporates supports (330) for the articles of mail as they move between the feed and franking modules. The supports are capable of synchronous movement with the vertical movements of the lower intake member (322) of the transporting system. Each support is in the form of a flap hinged along one long edge to a pivot (348) on the body or base (328) of the franking module; its other long edge rests on the lower guide plate (326). The machine also moistens and sticks down the flaps of envelopes.

Abstract (fr)

Machine de traitement de courrier comportant au moins d'une part un module d'affranchissement (32) comprenant au moins des moyens d'impression d'une empreinte postale sur un article de courrier et des moyens de transport (320,322) de cet article de courrier le long d'un chemin de transport des articles de courrier défini par des plaques supérieure (324) et inférieure (326) de guidage, ces moyens de transport comportant au moins des moyens de prise d'article de courrier, dont un moyen inférieur (322) mobile verticalement, disposés en entrée du module d'affranchissement et d'autre part un module d'alimentation en articles de courrier (30) disposé juste en amont du module d'affranchissement (32) et comprenant au moins des moyens de convoyage de ces articles de courrier (300,302) et un dispositif d'humectage (34), des moyens (330) étant en outre prévus pour supporter les articles de courrier dans leur déplacement entre le module d'alimentation (30) et le module d'affranchissement (32), ces moyens support étant susceptibles de se déplacer en synchronisme avec le déplacement vertical du moyen de prise inférieur (322). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B43M 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B43M 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B43M 5/042 (2013.01); Y10S 493/917 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004458 A1 20000531; EP 1004458 B1 20030709; DE 69909407 D1 20030814; DE 69909407 T2 20040519; FR 2786127 A1 20000526; FR 2786127 B1 20010302; US 2002184852 A1 20021212; US 6453642 B1 20020924; US 7096643 B2 20060829

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131202

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131123

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69909407

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140731

2014-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131123

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121120

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121130

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121121

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-06-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040414

2003-12-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031111

2003-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69909407 P 20030814

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-07-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001026

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI