Global Patent Index - EP 1004462 A1

EP 1004462 A1 2000-05-31 - Operating keypad, especially for vehicle air conditioning system

Title (en)

Operating keypad, especially for vehicle air conditioning system

Title (de)

Bedientastatur, insbesondere für eine Kraftfahrzeug-Klimaanlage

Title (fr)

Clavier d'utilisation, notamment pour un dispositif de climatisation pour véhicule

Publication

EP 1004462 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99120582 A

Priority

DE 19853753 A

Abstract (en)

The key-pad has a housing in which a circuit board is housed with electrical and electronic components. Several keys of the key-pad act on switches on the circuit board. The keys (4) are inserted onto guide plungers (10) and held inside a catch (11) which limits their movement within two stops (12,13), the switch being operated within this displacement range.

Abstract (de)

Eine bekannte Bedientastatur mit Tasten, die Schalter betätigen, weist eine große Bautiefe auf. Hiergegen sieht die neue Ausführung vor, daß die Tasten (4) von der Bedienseite her mit Führungsansätzen (7) auf Führungsstempel (10) aufgeschoben und innerhalb einer Verrastung (11) gehalten sind, die eine Verstellung innerhalb zweier Anschläge (12,13) begrenzt, wobei der von der Taste (4) betätigte Schalter (5) innerhalb der Verstellung ein- und ausschaltet. Mit der neuen Ausführung ist eine sehr flache und wirtschaftlich herstellbare Bedientastatur gegeben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60H 1/00; H01H 13/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/02 (2006.01); B60H 1/00 (2006.01); H01H 13/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/70 (2013.01); H01H 2207/002 (2013.01); H01H 2219/01 (2013.01); H01H 2221/026 (2013.01); H01H 2221/03 (2013.01); H01H 2223/012 (2013.01); H01H 2227/036 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19853753 A1 20000525; EP 1004462 A1 20000531; EP 1004462 B1 20031126; ES 2209311 T3 20040616; JP 2000203240 A 20000725; US 6180904 B1 20010130

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071016

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081022

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051003

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061017

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2008-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20061017

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061016

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070629

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20061016

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051018

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-10-14 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051014

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-10-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051003

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040827

2004-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2209311

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-05-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-01-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59907854

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-01-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-12-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-11-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020816

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000321

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI