Global Patent Index - EP 1004513 A1

EP 1004513 A1 2000-05-31 - Apparatus and method for applying glue to banderoles

Title (en)

Apparatus and method for applying glue to banderoles

Title (de)

Banderolenbeleimungsvorrichtung und -verfahren

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour appliquer de la colle sur des banderoles

Publication

EP 1004513 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98122510 A

Priority

EP 98122510 A

Abstract (en)

A series of cigarette pack taxation revenue stamps are printed on a strip of paper which is dispensed from an assembly. Glue is applied to the lower face of the strip before application of strip sections to the cigarette packs. The glue is dispensed by mixer jets (7, 9, 12) in two lines. The strip is fed through a guide and applied by contact.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung und ein Verfahren zum Aufbringen von Leim auf Banderolen, insbesondere Banderolen für Cigarettenschachteln, mit einer Leimversorgung, einer Düsenvorrichtung (7, 9, 12), einer Führung für die zu beleimenden Banderolen und einer Steuerungsvorrichtung für die Leimzuführung, wobei die Düsenvorrichtung (7, 9, 12) einen Leimverteiler (7) aufweist, der den Leim im Kontaktverfahren zweispurig auf die Banderole aufbringt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65C 9/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65C 3/26 (2006.01); B65B 19/00 (2006.01); B65C 9/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65C 9/2221 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004513 A1 20000531; EP 1004513 B1 20040121; CA 2286827 A1 20000527; DE 59810635 D1 20040226; JP 2000168755 A 20000620; KR 20000052379 A 20000825; US 6613149 B1 20030902

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081127

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-09-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081127

2009-08-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090601

2009-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090601

2009-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081127

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071011

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071018

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071022

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071029

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20071017

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-01-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041022

2004-10-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810635 P 20040226

2004-02-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040121

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2004-01-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030102

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000707

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI