Global Patent Index - EP 1004516 A1

EP 1004516 A1 2000-05-31 - Method for closing the unthreaded neck of glass containers

Title (en)

Method for closing the unthreaded neck of glass containers

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Verschliessen eines mit einem gewindelosen Hals versehenen Glassbehälters

Title (fr)

Procédé de bouchage d'un récipient muni d'une bague de verre non filetée

Publication

EP 1004516 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402918 A

Priority

FR 9815005 A

Abstract (en)

The container or bottle has a neck (1) with a flat unthreaded standard collar with a shoulder (10) near the opening A threaded plastics collar (3) and a plugging cap are also provided. The plastics collar has an internal diameter adapted to its fixing on the neck. The threaded collar is fixed to the neck by forcing it against the shoulder. The plugging cap is assembled on the threaded collar by crimping it on the collar thread (32) and also possibly under the lower rim (33) of this collar.

Abstract (fr)

Le procédé est caractérisé en ce que a) on approvisionne un récipient ou bouteille ayant un goulot (1) à bague plate standard non filetée avec contre-bague (10), une bague filetée en matière plastique (3) et une capsule de bouchage (2), ladite bague (3) ayant un diamètre intérieur adapté à sa fixation ultérieure audit goulot (1), b) on fixe ladite bague filetée (3) audit goulot (1) en la plaçant à force sous la contre-bague ou épaulement (10) de ladite bague de verrerie, c) on assemble ladite capsule de bouchage (2) sur ladite bague filetée (3) en la sertissant sur le filetage (31, 32) de ladite bague filetée (3) et aussi éventuellement sous le rebord inférieur (33) de ladite bague filetée (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 41/38; B65D 41/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 41/04 (2006.01); B65D 41/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 41/045 (2013.01); B65D 41/385 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004516 A1 20000531; FR 2786173 A1 20000526; FR 2786173 B1 20010105

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010904

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010219

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001127

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI