Global Patent Index - EP 1004522 A2

EP 1004522 A2 2000-05-31 - Pouch for containing retort food

Title (en)

Pouch for containing retort food

Title (de)

Beutel für erhitzbare Nahrungsmittel

Title (fr)

Sachet pour nourriture pouvant être chauffée

Publication

EP 1004522 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99309351 A

Priority

  • JP 33249498 A
  • JP 32500299 A

Abstract (en)

A retort pouch in which proliferation of heat-resistant bacteria is inhibited is provided according to the present invention. The proliferation is preferably inhibited by electron beam irradiation onto a food material or food. The retort pouch according to the present invention can be preserved under warm conditions for a long time.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 81/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23L 3/00 (2006.01); A23L 3/32 (2006.01); B65D 81/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/34 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004522 A2 20000531; EP 1004522 A3 20010502; JP 2000217558 A 20000808

INPADOC legal status


2002-06-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011103

2002-03-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 65D 81/24 A, 7A 23L 3/26 B, 7B 65D 81/00 B

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991206

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI