Global Patent Index - EP 1004529 A1

EP 1004529 A1 2000-05-31 - A roller feed device for a print substrate of non-uniform thickness

Title (en)

A roller feed device for a print substrate of non-uniform thickness

Title (de)

Rollenzuführgerät für ein Drucksubstrat mit nicht-einheitlicher Dicke

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'alimentation à rouleaux pour un support d'impression d'épaisseur non-uniforme

Publication

EP 1004529 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98830705 A

Priority

EP 98830705 A

Abstract (en)

A roller feed device (154a, 154b) for a print substrate (127) of non-uniform thickness in a transverse direction relative to a feed axis comprises a first feed unit (154a) and a second feed unit (154b) disposed substantially opposite one another, each feed unit (154a; 154b) having a shaft (205; 236) perpendicular to the feed axis for connection to a drive motor for rotating the shaft (205; 236), and at least one friction roller (220a-220e; 238a-238e) mounted on the shaft (205; 236) in order to be rotated by the shaft (205; 236), the friction rollers (220a-220e; 238a-238e) acting on the print substrate (127) in an operative condition in which the print substrate (127) is interposed between the first feed unit (154a) and the second feed unit (154b), in which the shaft (205) of at least one (154b) of the first and second feed units (154a; 154b) is resiliently deformable by flexure in order to bend according to the thickness of the print substrate (127) in the operative condition. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 27/00; B41J 13/12; B41J 13/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 3/28 (2006.01); B41J 13/03 (2006.01); B41J 25/308 (2006.01); B65H 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 27/00 (2013.01); B41J 3/28 (2013.01); B41J 3/283 (2013.01); B41J 13/03 (2013.01); B41J 25/308 (2013.01); B65H 2404/133 (2013.01); B65H 2404/144 (2013.01); B65H 2404/185 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004529 A1 20000531; EP 1004529 B1 20030423; CN 1254651 A 20000531; DE 69813831 D1 20030528; DE 69813831 T2 20040226

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131124

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131202

2014-09-04 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69813831

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131124

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140731

2014-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131124

2014-06-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69813831

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121128

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121129

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121211

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121129

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2005-11-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051124

2004-04-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040126

2004-02-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-16 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-07-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: C.P.G. INTERNATIONAL S.P.A.

2003-05-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69813831 P 20030528

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-04-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020619

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001114

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI