Global Patent Index - EP 1004531 A2

EP 1004531 A2 2000-05-31 - Buckling folder with adjustable folding gap

Title (en)

Buckling folder with adjustable folding gap

Title (de)

Stauchfalzmaschine mit einstellbaren Falzspaltweiten

Title (fr)

Plieuse à poches avec intervalles réglables pour le pliage

Publication

EP 1004531 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99119475 A

Priority

DE 29820796 U

Abstract (en)

The machine automatically adjusts the folding rollers (W1-W5) to give different seam widths dependent on the measured or computed thickness of the paper sheet or stack passing through the seam gap (F1-F4). Each adjustable roller is mounted on a pair of coaxial swing arms (22) actuated by an electrically-controlled adjuster against spring action (26) and under control of an electronic computer. The adjusters (S1-S5) consists of pneumatic rams functioning in cascade and whose working strokes are added together. These strokes can have different values, that of each ram being double that of the one preceding it.

Abstract (de)

Die Stauchfalzmaschine ist mit einer Vorrichtung versehen, mittels welcher die Falzwalzen (W1 bis W5) in Abhängigkeit von der gemessenen oder rechnerisch ermittelten Dicke eines den Falzspalt (F1 bis F4) durchlaufenden Papierblattes oder Stapels selbsttätig auf unterschiedliche Falzspaltweiten eingestellt werden können. Die zu verstellenden Falzwalzen sind jeweils an paarweise koaxial gelagerten Schwenkhebeln (22) gelagert, welche unter dem Einfluß von elektrisch steuerbaren Stellgliedern (S1 bis S5) gegen permanente Rückstellkräfte (Feder 26) schwenkbar sind. Die Ansteuerung der Stellglieder erfolgt durch einen elektronischen Prozeßrechner, der die jeweils einzustellenden Falzspaltweiten nach einem vorgegebenen Arbeitsprogramm aus gemessenen und/oder manuell eingegebenen Papierdicken oder Stapeldicken und/oder Falzarten errechnet. Die Stellglieder (S1 bis S5) bestehen jeweils aus mehreren kaskadenartig reihenweise angeordneten pneumatischen Arbeitszylindern, deren Arbeitshübe sich gegenseitig addieren. Das Einstellen der Falzwalzen kann somit sehr schnell und jeweils auch temporär für eine nur kurze Zeitdauer erfolgen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 45/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 45/16 (2006.01); B65H 45/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 45/144 (2013.01); B65H 45/147 (2013.01); B65H 45/148 (2013.01); B65H 2511/13 (2013.01); B65H 2511/22 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/13 + B65H 2220/01
  2. B65H 2511/22 + B65H 2220/02 + B65H 2220/11

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29820796 U1 19990211; EP 1004531 A2 20000531; EP 1004531 A3 20000823; EP 1004531 B1 20021204; ES 2188081 T3 20030616; JP 2000153960 A 20000606; US 6475129 B1 20021105

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2004-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031001

2004-07-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-05-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-05-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030930

2004-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2003-11-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-10-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-09-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-08-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2188081 T3

2003-03-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030213

2003-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903641 20030116

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-12-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020620

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001013

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI