Global Patent Index - EP 1004535 A2

EP 1004535 A2 2000-05-31 - Method for operating an automatic cross-winding machine during batch changing

Title (en)

Method for operating an automatic cross-winding machine during batch changing

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betreiben eines Kreuzspulautomaten bei Partiewechsel

Title (fr)

Procédé de fonctionnement d'un bobinoir à fil croisé automatique pendant le changement de lot

Publication

EP 1004535 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99120208 A

Priority

DE 19854375 A

Abstract (en)

Between textile production batches, bobbins are changed in an automatic traverse winding frame which has numerous identical winding heads arranged in sections, with feed and removal transport passages. The transport passages run through many different paths including via transverse routes. Dishes run through the passages with bobbins and empty sleeves. The old batch of yarn is removed section by section. Each section of bobbins is progressively emptied via the transverse passages. Empty dishes are transported to a group of winding heads, while the adjacent group is cleared. While the machine is charged with bobbins for the new batch, an empty dish is released from each transverse passage, and the dish replaced in the passage from the holding passage.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Durchführen eines Partiewechsels an einem Kreuzspulautomaten, der eine Vielzahl gleichartiger, sektionsweise (A,B,C,D) angeordneter Spulstellen sowie ein Transportsystem (21) zum Ver- und Entsorgen der Spulstellen aufweist. Innerhalb dieses Transportsystems (21), das eine Vielzahl unterschiedlicher Transportstrecken (1-12), unter anderem zu den Spulstellen führende Quertransportstrecken (6) aufweist, laufen Transportteller (17,18,19) um, die Spinnkopse oder Leerhülsen befördern. Erfindungsgemäß erfolgt das Abräumen einer alten Garnpartie sektionsweise. Das heißt, aus den Quertransportstrecken (6) einer Spulstellensektion (A,B,C,D) werden so lange spinnkopstragende Transportteller (19) ausschleusen, bis die betreffende Spulstellensektion leergeräumt ist. Dabei wird mit dem Zwischenspeichern leerer Transportteller (17) in den Quertransportstrecken einer leergeräumten Spulstellensektion bereits begonnen, während benachbarte Spulstellensektionen noch geräumt werden. Beim Füllen des Kreuzspulautomaten mit Spinnkopsen einer neuen Garnpartie wird aus den Quertransportstrecken gleichzeitig jeweils ein leerer Transportteller (17) pro Quertransportstrecke (6) ausgeschleust und die entstandenen Freiplätze auf den Quertransportstrecken über die Speicherstrecke gleichmäßig mit Transporttellern (19) aufgefüllt, die Spinnkopse der neuen Garnpartie tragen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 67/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/02 (2006.01); B65H 54/70 (2006.01); B65H 67/04 (2006.01); B65H 67/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 67/06 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004535 A2 20000531; EP 1004535 A3 20001206; EP 1004535 B1 20040102; DE 19854375 A1 20000531; JP 2000159437 A 20000613; JP 4574769 B2 20101104; US 6340131 B1 20020122

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151009

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141022

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59908190

- Effective date: 20110502

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091029

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-08-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2004-12-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041005

2004-10-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20041026

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908190 P 20040205

2004-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2003-10-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR IT LI

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010606

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI