Global patent index - EP 1004539 A1

EP 1004539 A1 2000-05-31 - Device for fastening rollers of escalator step or conveyor pallet

Title (en)

Device for fastening rollers of escalator step or conveyor pallet

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Befestigung von Laufrollen einer Fahrtreppenstufe oder einer Fahrsteigpalette

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation des galets d'une marche d'escalier roulant ou d'une palette de convoyeur

Publication

EP 1004539 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99123457 A

Priority

  • EP 99123457 A
  • EP 98811163 A
  • US 44711499 A

Abstract (en)

A method for fitting support rollers (3) to an escalator step has each step formed in one piece with the side support flanges. The one piece construction includes a stub axle on each flange, with stepped profiles onto which the support rollers are fitted via a press fit operation. Each support roller is secured by a self tapping screw (9) into a bore in the stub axle. The fitting is completed by a sprung washer (14) under the head of the screw.

Abstract (de)

An der Unterseite einer Fahrtreppenstufe ist je Seite ein Träger angeordnet, wobei am oberen Trägerende eine erste Befestigung für eine Transportkette und am unteren Trägerende eine zweite Befestigung (6) für eine Laufrolle vorgesehen ist. Die zweite Befestigung (6) besteht aus einem Ausleger (7) und einem Lagerbolzen (8) mit einer Bohrung (9), die integrierte Bestandteile der Fahrtreppenstufe sind, wobei Fahrtreppenstufe, Ausleger (7), Lagerbolzen (8) und Bohrung (9) in einem Guss hergestellt sind. Weder der Lagerbolzen (8) noch die Bohrung (9) brauchen nachbearbeitet zu werden. Das Lager (11) ist auf den Lagerbolzen (8) aufschiebbar. Um den Arbeitsgang des Gewindeschneidens zu sparen, wird zur Fixierung des Lagers (11) eine Senkfurchschraube (13) verwendet. Die Senkfurchschraube (13) formt plastisch ein exaktes Innengewinde in die Bohrung (9). Beim Festziehen der Schraube (13) presst eine der Schraube (13) unterlegte Scheibe (14) auf einen Innennring (12) des Lagers (11), wodurch das Lager (11) an einer Schulter (10) exakt positioniert und von der Scheibe (14) gehalten ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 23/10; B65G 39/20; B66B 23/12; B66B 23/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 23/00 (2006.01); B65G 39/20 (2006.01); B66B 21/00 (2006.01); B66B 23/08 (2006.01); B66B 23/10 (2006.01); B66B 23/12 (2006.01); B66B 23/14 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

B65G (2006.01); B66B (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 23/145 (2013.01); B66B 23/10 (2013.01); B66B 23/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6405848 B1 20020618; AR 021401 A1 20020717; AT 272567 T 20040815; AU 6064099 A 20000601; AU 754970 B2 20021128; BR 9905739 A 20000905; CA 2290152 A1 20000525; CA 2290152 C 20070807; CN 1101330 C 20030212; CN 1254677 A 20000531; DE 59910121 D1 20040909; DK 1004539 T3 20041115; EP 1004539 A1 20000531; EP 1004539 B1 20040804; ES 2226268 T3 20050316; HK 1027794 A1 20050208; JP 2000233883 A 20000829; JP 4564617 B2 20101020; KR 100690220 B1 20070312; KR 20000052366 A 20000825; NO 995639 A 20000526; NO 995639 D0 19991117; PT 1004539 E 20041130; TR 9902901 A2 20000721; TR 9902901 A3 20000721; ZA 9906982 B 20000518

INPADOC legal status

2016-02-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151111

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151105

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151112

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151204

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151111

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091125

2011-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-10-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091125

2010-08-18 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2010-07-19 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2010-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-02-27 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081127

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081118

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081124

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081127

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081113

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-07-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2226268

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-03-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-02-08 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: GR

- Ref Document Number: 1027794

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2004-11-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-11-24 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20040403347

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2004-11-23 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-11-15 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2004-09-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040903

2004-09-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59910121

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-09-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-08-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-08-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021209

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001016

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI