Global patent index - EP 1004542 A1

EP 1004542 A1 2000-05-31 - Hydraulic system especially for an industrial truck

Title (en)

Hydraulic system especially for an industrial truck

Title (de)

Hydraulische Anlage insbesondere für ein Flurförderzeug

Title (fr)

Système hydraulique notamment pour un chariot de manutention

Publication

EP 1004542 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99123341 A

Priority

DE 19854417 A

Abstract (en)

A work machine, especially an industrial truck, has a hydraulic plant that has at least one tank (1) for hydraulic fluid and at least one hydraulic pump (5). The hydraulic pump is located inside the tank. An electrical drive motor (3) of the hydraulic pump is located inside the tank. An electrical drive motor (3) of the hydraulic pump is located outside the tank and a shaft connecting the two is sealed with a shaft seal with respect to the tank. A priority valve is located inside the tank and is fastened by a flange connection to the hydraulic pump.

Abstract (de)

Gegenstand der Erfindung ist eine Arbeitsmaschine, insbesondere Flurförderzeug, mit einer hydraulischen Anlage, die mindestens einen Tank (1) für Hydraulikfluid und mindestens eine Hydraulikpumpe (5) aufweist. Erfindungsgemäß ist die Hydraulikpumpe (5) innerhalb des Tanks (1) angeordnet. Ein Prioritätsventil (8a) ist mittels einer Flanschverbindung an der Hydraulikpumpe (5) befestigt. Ein elektrischer Antriebsmotor (3) der Hydraulikpumpe (5) kann ebenfalls innerhalb des Tanks (1) angeordnet sein. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66F 9/22; F04B 17/03; F04B 23/02; F15B 1/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/22 (2006.01); F04B 17/03 (2006.01); F04B 23/02 (2006.01); F15B 1/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/22 (2013.01); F04B 17/03 (2013.01); F04B 23/021 (2013.01); F04B 23/023 (2013.01); F15B 1/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004542 A1 20000531; EP 1004542 B1 20060125; DE 19854417 A1 20000531; DE 59913077 D1 20060413; US 6290474 B1 20010918

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071123

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-11-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080930

2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2007-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20061026

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-11-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061108

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-10-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-08-23 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20060125

2006-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59913077

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-04-13

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-01-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-01-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-01-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060125

2006-01-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060125

2005-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041217

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000610

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI