Global Patent Index - EP 1004556 A1

EP 1004556 A1 2000-05-31 - Hydraulic binder composition and its use

Title (en)

Hydraulic binder composition and its use

Title (de)

Hydraulische Bindemittelzusammensetzung sowie deren Verwendung

Title (fr)

Composition de liant hydraulique et son utilisation

Publication

EP 1004556 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99117564 A

Priority

DE 19854476 A

Abstract (en)

Hydraulic binder composition comprises: a ground hydraulic binder free from a sulfate carrier, a plasticizing solidifying delaying agent containing sulfonate groups, a hardening accelerator, and a fluxing agent containing sulfonate groups.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine hydraulische Bindemittelzusammensetzung, die im wesentlichen mindestens ein gemahlenes sulfatträgerfreies hydraulisches Bindemittel, mindestens einen sulfonatgruppenhaltigen plastifizierenden Erstarrungsverzögerer, mindestens einen Erhärtungsbeschleuniger und mindestens ein sulfonatgruppenfreies Fließmittel aufweist sowie deren Verwendung.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C04B 28/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C04B 28/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C04B 28/04 (2013.01); C04B 2111/1006 (2013.01); C04B 2111/1018 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C04B 28/04 + C04B 22/106 + C04B 24/16 + C04B 24/2647

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004556 A1 20000531; EP 1004556 B1 20010613; AT 202064 T 20010615; CZ 9903979 A3 20011017; DK 1004556 T3 20010917; ES 2158718 T3 20010901; GR 3036607 T3 20011231; HU 0200182 D0 20020328; HU 222042 B1 20030428; HU 9903997 A2 20001028; HU 9903997 A3 20020228; HU 9903997 D0 19991228; NO 20020658 A 20000526; NO 20020658 D0 20020211; NO 995187 A 20000526; NO 995187 D0 19991025; PL 336756 A1 20000605; PT 1004556 E 20011030; SK 155499 A3 20000612

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050906

2006-06-14 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060401

2006-05-31 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20060327

2006-05-31 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20060327

2006-05-23 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-05-01 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2005-09-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-07 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050907

2005-09-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050906

2005-09-06 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050906

2005-09-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050906

2004-11-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041123

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040930

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-09-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040928

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-09-23 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040923

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-09-22 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20040922

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-09-22 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20040922

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-09-14 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040914

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-09-10 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040910

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-09-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040910

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-09-10 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20040910

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-09-08 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20040908

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-09-08 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040908

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-09-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HEIDELBERGER ZEMENT AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2004-09-01 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040901

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-09-01 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20040901

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-06-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-06-30 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: HEIDELBERGER ZEMENT AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20020312

2004-06-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HEIDELBERGER ZEMENT AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2004-04-07 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: HEIDELBERGER ZEMENT AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT ZELLENTIN &

- Effective date: 20020312

2004-03-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2003-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2002-09-03 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20020903

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-08-09 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20020809

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-07-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HEIDELBERGER ZEMENT AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2002-05-08 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HEIDELBERGER ZEMENT AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-10-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010906

2001-09-17 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2158718 T3

2001-08-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-08-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. A. GIAMBROCONO & C. S.R.L.

2001-07-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900121 20010719

2001-07-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BRAUN & PARTNER PATENT-, MARKEN-, RECHTSANWAELTE

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-13 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010613

2001-06-13 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010613

2001-06-13 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010613

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 202064 T 20010615

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000626

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000201

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI