Global Patent Index - EP 1004655 A2

EP 1004655 A2 2000-05-31 - Automatic dishwashing composition

Title (en)

Automatic dishwashing composition

Title (de)

Maschinengeschirrspülmittel

Title (fr)

Composition detergente pour lave-vaiselle

Publication

EP 1004655 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99120429 A

Priority

DE 19854960 A

Abstract (en)

Liquid to pasty detergent for dishwashing machine contains a crystalline foliated silicate (I) besides usual components. Liquid to pasty detergent for dishwashing machine contains a crystalline foliated silicate of formula (I) besides usual components. A2O.bBO.cC2O3.dD2O5.eSiO2.fH2O (I) A = an alkali metal and/or hydrogen; B = an alkaline earth metal; C = a main group III element; D = a main group V element; a = 0-1; b = 0-0.5; c/e = 0-0.05; d/e = 0-0.25; e = 1.9-4; f = 0-20. An Independent claim is also included for the production of the detergent.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein flüssiges bis pastöses Maschinengeschirrspülmittel, dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß es neben üblichen Maschinengeschirrspülmittelinhaltsstoffen ein kristallines, schichtförmiges Silikat der allgemeinen Formel a A2O · b BO · c C2O3 · d D2O5 · e SiO2 · f H2O enthält, in der A ein Alkalimetall und/oder Wasserstoff B ein Erdalkalimetall, C ein Element der dritten Hauptgruppe des Periodensystems und D ein Element der fünften Hauptgruppe des Periodensystems bedeuten und weiterhin gilt: 0 <= a <= 1; 0 <= b <= 0,5; 0 <= c/e <= 0,05; 0 <= d/e <= 0,25; 1,9 <= e <= 4; 0 <= f <= 20. Die Erfindung betrifft auch ein Verfahren zur Herstellung dieses Maschinengeschirrspülmittels und seine Verwendung.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/12; C11D 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/08 (2006.01); C11D 3/12 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 1/14 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01); C11D 1/75 (2006.01); C11D 1/755 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/003 (2013.01); C11D 3/08 (2013.01); C11D 3/1273 (2013.01); C11D 1/143 (2013.01); C11D 1/146 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01); C11D 1/75 (2013.01); C11D 1/755 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004655 A2 20000531; EP 1004655 A3 20020925; CA 2291419 A1 20000529; CA 2291419 C 20030610; DE 19854960 A1 20000531; US 6539954 B1 20030401

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-01 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20041104

2004-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040220

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030325

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 11D 3/12 A, 7C 11D 3/08 B, 7C 11D 17/00 B

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI