Global Patent Index - EP 1004656 B1

EP 1004656 B1 2000-12-27 - Densified granulate, its manufacturing process and its use as disintegrant for compacted mouldings

Title (en)

Densified granulate, its manufacturing process and its use as disintegrant for compacted mouldings

Title (de)

Verdichtetes Granulat, Herstellungsverfahren und Verwendung als Sprengmittel für gepresste Formkörper

Title (fr)

Granulé densifié, procédé pour sa fabrication et son utilisation comme désintégrant dans des corps formés par compactage

Publication

EP 1004656 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98121397 A

Priority

EP 98121397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1004656A1] Compressed granulate contains highly pure cellulose and/or cellulose derivative that is insoluble but swells in water, finely-divided (co)polymer of (meth)acrylic acid or salt and liquid surfactant(s) that thickens or forms a gel with water. An Independent claim is also included for the production of the compressed granulate.

Abstract (de)

Verdichtetes Granulat aus in Wasser quellbarer Cellulose und/oder Cellulosederivaten und feinteiligen Polymeren/Copolymeren von (Meth)acrylsäure oder Salzen derselben und ein oder mehreren flüssigen Tensiden und dessen Verwendung als Sprengmittel für Waschmitteltabletten, Reinigungsmitteltabletten, Wasserenthärtungstabletten Fleckensalztabletten, sowie ein Verfahren zum Herstellen des verdichteten Granulats durch Mischen der Bestandteile, Granulieren und Verdichten.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/22; C11D 3/37; C11D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/22 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/0073 (2013.01); C11D 3/222 (2013.01); C11D 3/3761 (2013.01); C11D 17/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004656 A1 20000531; EP 1004656 B1 20001227; AT 198348 T 20010115; CZ 290160 B6 20020612; CZ 9903977 A3 20000816; DE 59800410 D1 20010201; DK 1004656 T3 20010205; ES 2153229 T3 20010216; HU 228025 B1 20120828; HU 9903991 A2 20000828; HU 9903991 A3 20000928; HU 9903991 D0 20000128; PL 191104 B1 20060331; PL 336514 A1 20000522; PT 1004656 E 20010430; TR 9902772 A2 20000621; TR 9902772 A3 20000621; US 6232285 B1 20010515

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161114

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20161110

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20161118

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161123

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161118

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161118

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161118

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161122

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20161111

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161027

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20161118

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-03-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59800410

- Representative's name: FLEISCHER, ENGELS & PARTNER MBB, PATENTANWAELT, DE

2007-03-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20061114

2007-01-17 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20061114

2004-08-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: DALLI-WERKE GMBH & CO. KG

2004-05-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: DALLI-WERKE GMBH & CO. KG

2004-05-07 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-09-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: DALLI-WERKE WAESCHE- UND KOERPERPFLEGE GMBH & CO.

2003-08-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: DALLI-WERKE WAESCHE- UND KOERPERPFLEGE GMBH & CO.

2003-07-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-06-11 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: DALLI-WERKE WAESCHE- UND KOERPERPFLEGE GMBH & CO

2003-03-14 [REG CH PUEA] ASSIGNMENT OF THE SHARE

- Owner name: DALLI-WERKE WAESCHE- UND KOERPERPFLEGE GMBH & CO.

- Free text: DALLI-WERKE WAESCHE- UND KOERPERPFLEGE GMBH & CO. KG#ZWEIFALLER STRASSE 120#D-52220 STOLBERG (DE) $ STOCKHAUSEN GMBH & CO. KG#BAEKERPFAD 25#47805 KREFELD (DE) -TRANSFER TO- DALLI-WERKE WAESCHE- UND KOERPERPFLEGE GMBH & CO. KG#ZWEIFALLER STRASSE 120#D-52220 STOLBERG (DE)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA

2001-11-14 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2001-10-24 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA

- Effective date: 20010828

2001-04-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010118

2001-03-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MARIETTI E GISLON S.R.L.

2001-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153229 T3

2001-02-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-02-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-02-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800410 20010201

2001-01-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010103

2000-12-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-12-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO JEAN HUNZIKER

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 198348 T 20010115

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991005

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI