Global Patent Index - EP 1004657 A1

EP 1004657 A1 2000-05-31 - The use of a peroxygen bleach as a fabric/textile softening agent

Title (en)

The use of a peroxygen bleach as a fabric/textile softening agent

Title (de)

Verwendung von einem Peroxy-Bleichmittel als Wäscheweichmacher

Title (fr)

Utilisation d'un agent de blanchiment peroxydé en tant qu'agent adoucissant pour textile

Publication

EP 1004657 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98870259 A

Priority

EP 98870259 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to the use of a peroxygen bleach as a fabric/textile softening ingredient in a composition to treat fabrics and/or textiles whereby softness characteristics are provided to said fabrics and/or textiles.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/39; C11D 3/00; C11D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06L 3/02 (2006.01); C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01); C11D 7/54 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/08 (2006.01); D06B 1/02 (2006.01); D06M 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/3945 (2013.01); C11D 3/001 (2013.01); C11D 3/3942 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004657 A1 20000531; AU 1172200 A 20000619; BR 9915691 A 20010814; CA 2348944 A1 20000608; EP 1133546 A1 20010919; JP 2002531715 A 20020924; TR 200101436 T2 20011022; WO 0032732 A1 20000608

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030913

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 11D 3/39 A

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001125

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI