Global patent index - EP 1004692 A2

EP 1004692 A2 2000-05-31 - Method of operating a carding machine and flats for carrying out such a method

Title (en)

Method of operating a carding machine and flats for carrying out such a method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Karde und Deckel zur Durchführung derartiger Verfahren

Title (fr)

Procédé pour faire fonctionner une machine de cardage et chapeaux pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé

Publication

EP 1004692 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112186 A

Priority

DE 19854194 A

Abstract (en)

In a carding assembly, with a card drum (10) and a number of flats (20), the set gap (d) between the drum clothing (12) and the flat clothing (22) is adjusted by working the contact area of the flats. Each flat has a laying surface (32) parallel to the contact area for the flat clothing. By working the gap between the contact area and the laying surface, all the flats have the same value. The flat contact surface area is worked when new clothing is fitted. The working is by copy-milling and/or copy-grinding. The grinding process uses boron nitride, and especially with a boron nitride grinding ring. The contact area is of a harder material than the body of the flat, and the contact element is a pin of hardened steel. The pin has a circular cross section, flattened at the contact area to form a rectangular cross section. The pin (26) is bonded to the carrier (24) in a force fit, positive fit and/or by material bonding.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Karde mit einem Tambourgarnitur aufweisenden Tambour und einer Anzahl von jeweils mit einer Deckelgarnitur versehen Deckeln wird vorgeschlagen, einen vorgegebenen Abstand zwischen der Tambourgarnitur und den Deckelgarnituren durch eine Aufbereitung von Deckellaufflächen der Deckel einzustellen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 15/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 15/14 (2006.01); D01G 15/24 (2006.01); D01G 15/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 15/28 (2013.01); D01G 15/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19854194 A1 20000525; AT 276389 T 20041015; EP 1004692 A2 20000531; EP 1004692 A3 20010502; EP 1004692 B1 20040915; ES 2224500 T3 20050301; JP 2000160437 A 20000613

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070624

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070625

2008-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20070625

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050215

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GRAF + CIE A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20070630

2006-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-13 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060613

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-07 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060607

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-09-16 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2005-09-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050624

2005-04-13 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20040915

2005-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2005-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2224500

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-12-15 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-12-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-10-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59910509

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-10-21

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2004-09-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: SI

2004-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-09-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-15 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040915

2004-09-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040915

2004-09-15 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040915

2003-09-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: METHOD OF OPERATING A CARDING MACHINE AND FLATS FOR CARRYING OUT SUCH A METHOD

2003-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030616

2002-01-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE LI

2002-01-23 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20011102

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011102

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI