Global Patent Index - EP 1004694 A3

EP 1004694 A3 2000-11-02 - Method and device for rewinding of yarn packages

Title (en)

Method and device for rewinding of yarn packages

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Umwickeln eines gesponnenen Garnkörpers

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour l'opération de renbobinage de paquets de fil

Publication

EP 1004694 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99119993 A

Priority

DE 19854786 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1004694A2] To rewind a yarn package, formed at a pot spinner where the spun yarn is laid by centrifugal forces at the inner wall of the spinning pot (4), the winding sleeve (10) has one end to catch the yarn with a surplus length (15) between that end of the sleeve (10) and the drawing unit (1). The surplus yarn length (15) is severed, and removed by suction. The surplus yarn length is severed by cutting, when the spun yarn is held at one end by the rollers of the drawing unit (1) and the other end is held at the yarn body or the sleeve (10) under tension. The cutter is controlled through the relative movement between the sleeve and the yarn guide tube (6), where a rotation axis lies on the theoretical center line on the common longitudinal axes of the sleeve (10) and yarn guide tube (6). The suction, to remove the cut yarn, uses the suction unit to remove lint and debris from the yarn. The cut yarn (15) also be extracted by the suction system (28) at the mobile doffer (26), which also carries the cutter (27). An Independent claim is included for an appts. with at least one cutter to sever the surplus yarn length (15) from the wound yarn body (9), together with a suction system (28) to extract the severed yarn (15). Preferred Features: Each spinning station can have a cutter and suction unit to sever the surplus yarn length (15) for extraction, using the suction unit to extract the lint and debris and/or the suction unit (28) at the mobile doffer (26). The cutter has at least one moving blade, moving in the axial direction of the sleeve (10), or rotating round the axis of a center line formed by the common longitudinal axes of the sleeve (10) and the yarn guide tube (6). The blade has a crown shape. The rotary movement is through a groove at least in a partial spiral, to carry a bolt at the cutting blade. Or the cutter is carried by the mobile doffer (26), which is also fitted with a suction unit (28) to extract the cut yarn waste (15).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 9/06; D01H 9/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/08 (2006.01); D01H 9/06 (2006.01); D01H 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 9/18 (2013.01); D01H 9/06 (2013.01); Y10S 242/911 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004694 A2 20000531; EP 1004694 A3 20001102; EP 1004694 B1 20030820; AT 247729 T 20030915; CN 1255559 A 20000607; DE 19854786 A1 20000531; ES 2201613 T3 20040316; JP 2000160439 A 20000613; RU 2222651 C2 20040127; TR 9902893 A2 20000621; TR 9902893 A3 20000621; US 6244029 B1 20010612

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071013

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061014

2008-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20061014

2007-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2006-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051025

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-10-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20051024

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-10-06 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20051006

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-08-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2004-10-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041013

2004-08-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040524

2004-06-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2201613 T3

2003-10-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20031028

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-10-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031022

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-10-15 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

2003-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906663 P 20030925

2003-08-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010502

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI