Global Patent Index - EP 1004702 A2

EP 1004702 A2 2000-05-31 - Apparatus and process for applying a fluid or pasty coating onto a moving support

Title (en)

Apparatus and process for applying a fluid or pasty coating onto a moving support

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Auftragen eines flüssigen oder pastösen Auftragsmediums auf einen laufenden Untergrund

Title (fr)

Appareil et procédé pour appliquer une enduction fluide ou pâteuse sur un support en mouvement

Publication

EP 1004702 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99120178 A

Priority

DE 19854448 A

Abstract (en)

Apparatus (10) to apply a liquid or paste coating medium (14) to a moving web surface (U), has a doctor (26) mounted to a doctor bed (20) to form a dosing gap (32) with the web surface (U). At the web entry side of the doctor bed (20), a surface (20d) defines a build-up zone (30) for the coating medium (14) between the bed (20) and the moving web surface (U). At the web entry side of the doctor bed (20), a surface (20d) defines a build-up zone (30) for the coating medium (14) between the bed (20) and the moving web surface (U), where the medium carried by the moving web builds up in front of the dosing gap (32). A setting mechanism (28) positions the limit surface (20d) in relation to the moving web surface (U), to alter the shape of the build-up zone (30). Preferred Features: The coating medium build-up zone (30) has a length (D1) of 2-100 mm, measured along the direction (L) of web travel, and preferably 5-50 mm. The width (d1) of the build-up zone (30) is 0.5-5.0 mm and preferably 0.5-2.0 mm measured along (L) and across (Q) the web surface (U). The build-up zone (30) can have a compensation zone at the entry side with a length of 5-30 mm, along the running direction (L), and a width of 4-11 mm measured along (L) and across (Q) the web surface (U). The setting mechanism alters the shape of the build-up zone and also the compensation zone. The doctor bed (20) has a base section (20b) for the doctor (26). The entry zone defining surface (20d) projects from the base (20b), held by a flexible tongue (20c), with the setting mechanism (28) between the tongue (20c) and base (20b) sections. The setting mechanism can rotate the doctor body on an axis across the applicator. The free end of the tongue can be at a carrier for the applicator. The doctor body can be linked to an applicator carrier by a flexible member, with the setting mechanism between the doctor body and the carrier. The doctor (26) is a smooth or profiled doctor rod, with a diameter of 10-38 mm, preferably 24 mm. The limit surface has at least a smooth section (20d) against the doctor rod (26), with a gap of up to 1 mm on a theoretical tangential plane at the doctor surface parallel to the limit surface. The theoretical tangential plane of the limit surface forms an angle of up to 10 degrees with the moving web surface (U) in the dosing gap. The limit surface can have a section which is part of a cylindrical surface, with a radius of 10-600 mm, preferably 50 mm. The limit surface is secured with rounded transits. The limit surface (20d) of the doctor body (20) acts with the setting mechanism (28) so that, on a relative movement in relation to the moving web surface (U), the holder opening (20a) for the doctor rod (26) is unaffected. A further setting mechanism (34) determines the pressure of the doctor rod (26) against the web surface (U) and/or to fix the position of the doctor rod in the doctor body. The limit surface setting mechanism (28) has a number of lateral (Q) setting units, operated independently of each other. The setting units are operated electrically and/or hydraulically and/or pneumatically and/or hydropneumatically and/or manually. At least part of the setting mechanism is formed by a pressure hose (28) in sections or chambers. An Independent claim is included for the operation of a web coating station, where the weight of the applied coating is set by the position of the limit surface (20d) in relation to the moving web surface (U) at the build-up zone (30), to change the shape of the build-up zone (30). Preferred Features: The lateral profile of the applied coating layer on the web surface (U) is set by adjustment to the position of the limit surface (20d) by zones, in relation to the moving web surface (U).

Abstract (de)

Die erfindungsgemäße Vorrichtung (10) dient zum Auftragen eines flüssigen oder pastösen Auftragsmediums (14) auf einen laufenden Untergrund (U). Eine in einem Rakelbett (20) gelagerte Rakel (26) legt mit dem Untergrund (U) einen Dosierspalt (32) fest. Eine untergrund-einlaufseitige Begrenzungsfläche (20) des Rakelbetts (20) bildet mit dem Untergrund (U) einen entgegen der Laufrichtung (L) des Untergrunds (U) offenen und sich in Laufrichtung (L) des Untergrunds (U) stetig verjüngenden Stauraum (30), in welchem sich das vom Untergrund (U) mitgeführte Auftragsmedium (14) vor dem Dosierspalt (32) staut. Ferner ist eine Stellvorrichtung (28) vorgesehen zum Verändern der Relativlage der Begrenzungsfläche (20d) bezüglich des Untergrunds (U), d.h. zum Verändern der Gestalt des Stauraums (30). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 23/34; D21H 25/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 3/00 (2006.01); B05C 11/02 (2006.01); B05C 11/08 (2006.01); B21D 53/28 (2006.01); D21H 23/34 (2006.01); D21H 25/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 11/025 (2013.01); D21H 23/34 (2013.01); D21H 25/12 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004702 A2 20000531; EP 1004702 A3 20010801; DE 19854448 A1 20000531; JP 2000157916 A 20000613; JP 2000158071 A 20000613; US 6589340 B1 20030708

INPADOC legal status


2007-10-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070501

2006-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

2004-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040817

2002-04-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FI IT SE

2002-04-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020201

2001-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI IT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI