Global Patent Index - EP 1004705 A2

EP 1004705 A2 2000-05-31 - Road joint

Title (en)

Road joint

Title (de)

Fahrbahnübergang

Title (fr)

Joint de chausée

Publication

EP 1004705 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99118946 A

Priority

  • DE 19844899 A
  • DE 19852023 A

Abstract (en)

A carriageway expansion gap junction, with an expansion gap containing a highly compressible and extensible elastomeric insulation body (75), is new. A carriageway junction has a water-tight sealed edge expansion gap containing a highly flexible and extensible, elastomeric insulation body (75) which can be extended to more than two to three times the mean expansion gap width (Wdm), corresponding to the initial junction configuration, and can be compressed to less than half this mean gap width. In a junction configuration corresponding to a stress-free state of the insulation body, the insulation body has an upper carriageway-side face extending coplanar with the carriageway and a lower convex face projecting into an underlying compensation space (82). The compensation space (82) is sufficiently large that, in any junction configuration, it can completely accommodate that portion of the insulation body which is displaced by a reduction in the gap width from the mean value (Wdm). An independent claim is also included for production of the above carriageway junction, in which the insulation body (75) is produced by molding a liquid two-component elastomer, which cures to a highly extensible soft-elastic consistency, in the expansion space above the compensation space (82), a flexible extensible support strip (78) being fixed to the gap edges to act as a lost mold wall at the bottom of the molding space.

Abstract (de)

Ein Fahrbahnübergang (12,13) für die Überbrückung einer Dehnfuge zwischen Querrändern eines geländeseitigen Abschnittes einer Fahrbahn und eines durch eine Brückenplatte gebildeten Abschnittes der Fahrbahn, hat mindestens einen Dilatationsspalt (49), dessen Weite wd mit der Temperatur der Brückenplatte variieren kann. Der Dilatationsspalt (49) ist nach unten hin durch eine Faltlamelle (53) wasserdicht abgeschlossen. In den Dilatationsspalt ist ein dehnbarer und zusammendrückbarer Dämmkörper (75) eingefügt, der aus einem massiven, formelastischen Elastomer, hoher Flexibilität und Dehnfähigkeit besteht. In der einem spannungsfreien Zustand des Dämmkörpers (75) entsprechenden Konfiguration des Fahrbahnüberganges (12,13) verläuft die fahrbahnseitige Begrenzungsfläche des Dämmkörpers koplanar oder annähernd koplanar mit der Fahrbahnebene. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01D 19/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01D 19/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01D 19/06 (2013.01); E01D 19/062 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004705 A2 20000531; EP 1004705 A3 20011017; DE 29824869 U1 20030206

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040701

2002-08-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-07-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2002-07-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH LI

2002-06-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020417

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ROAD JOINT

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH LI

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI