Global Patent Index - EP 1004706 A4

EP 1004706 A4 2000-11-02 - PROJECTING INDICATOR AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME

Title (en)

PROJECTING INDICATOR AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME

Title (de)

HERVORSTEHENDE ANZEIGE UND IHR HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

INDICATEUR EN RELIEF ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 1004706 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98935284 A

Priority

  • JP 9803398 W
  • JP 20658897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9906637A1] A projecting indicator which comprises a plurality of projections fixed to an object surface, such as a road surface or a wall surface, and which is used mainly as a guide sign for visually handicapped persons; and a method of manufacturing the same. The indicator is characterized by comprising projections (8) formed separately from an object surface (7), such as a road surface or a wall surface, and being fixed to the object surface (7) by solidifying a solidifiable substance (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01F 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 23/16 (2006.01); E01C 23/20 (2006.01); E01C 23/24 (2006.01); E01F 9/015 (2006.01); E01F 9/03 (2006.01); E01F 9/04 (2006.01); E01F 9/047 (2006.01); E01F 13/02 (2006.01); A61H 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61H 3/066 (2013.01); E01F 9/50 (2016.02); E01F 13/022 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XAY] US 5385770 A 19950131 - JULNES JON N [US]
  • [X] US 5302049 A 19940412 - SCHMANSKI DONALD W [US]
  • [EA] US 5827009 A 19981027 - KOKOLETSOS BASIL GEORGE [US]
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 010 (M - 1199) 13 January 1992 (1992-01-13)
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 003, no. 089 (E - 126) 28 July 1979 (1979-07-28)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 04 30 April 1997 (1997-04-30)
  • See also references of WO 9906637A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9906637 A1 19990211; AU 8460898 A 19990222; EP 1004706 A1 20000531; EP 1004706 A4 20001102; JP 3103522 B2 20001030; JP H1150420 A 19990223

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031122

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030711

2000-11-02 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000914

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000211

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT