Global Patent Index - EP 1004721 B1

EP 1004721 B1 2001-04-11 - Distribution apparatus

Title (en)

Distribution apparatus

Title (de)

Verteilvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Installation de distribution

Publication

EP 1004721 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98811150 A

Priority

EP 98811150 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1004721A1] A connecting tube bend (14) in a device for distributing loose material on a surface (25) has one end connected to a material feed tube (13). Its other end is connected to a support tube (10) rotatable around an axis virtually vertical to the surface. To the support tube a distributor tube (21) is connected for ejecting material and is rotatable virtually parallel to the surface. The connecting tube bend is firmly connected to a table (11) positionable on the surface. The feed tube (13) locates on the surface and on the support tube at least one support with at least one roller (1) is fitted. The roller locates on ther table and by rotation of the support tube rolls on the table.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 21/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 21/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 21/04 (2013.01); E04G 21/0427 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004721 A1 20000531; EP 1004721 B1 20010411; AT 200551 T 20010415; DE 59800637 D1 20010517

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060601

2005-11-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051120

2005-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041129

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041120

2004-02-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040227

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-26 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030926

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-04-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-09-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-09-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-07-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800637 20010517

2001-04-12 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI NL

2001-04-11 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-04-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-04-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200551 T 20010415

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR IT LI NL

2000-11-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DISTRIBUTION APPARATUS

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990610

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI NL

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI