Global Patent Index - EP 1004725 A1

EP 1004725 A1 2000-05-31 - Operating device for a fitting of a window, door or similar

Title (en)

Operating device for a fitting of a window, door or similar

Title (de)

Betätigungsvorrichtung für eine Beschlagsvorrichtung eines Fensters, einer Tür oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'actionnement pour ferrure de fênetre, porte ou similaire

Publication

EP 1004725 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99122449 A

Priority

DE 19854589 A

Abstract (en)

Window or door fixture operating device comprises a first operating component with a first multi-edged recess in rotary drive with the one end of an operating shaft. The other end of the operatiug shaft works in conjunction with a second multi-edged recess on the fixture device. The operating shaft at its two ends has a multiple edge formation. Preferably in two multi-edged recesses (20,32) an intermediate component (26) is inserted non-rotatively. Opposite to the multi-edge recesses is a larger-sized multi-edged accommodation (25), in which the corresponding end (23,24) of the operating shaft (22) is non-rotatively inserted.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Betätigungsvorrichtung für eine Beschlagsvorrichtung eines Fensters, einer Tür oder dergleichen, mit einem eine erste Mehrkantausnehmung aufweisenden Betätigungselement, das mit dem einen Ende einer Betätigungswelle in Drehmitnahme steht, wobei das andere Ende der Betätigungswelle mit einer zweiten Mehrkantausnehmung an der Beschlagsvorrichtung zusammenwirkt, und wobei die Betätigungswelle an ihren beiden Enden einen Mehrkant aufweist, die sich dadurch auszeichnet, daß mindestens in eine der Mehrkantausnehmungen (20, 32), vorzugsweise in beide Mehrkantausnehmungen (20, 32), ein beziehungsweise jeweils ein Zwischenelement (26) drehfest eingesteckt ist, das gegenüber der beziehungsweise den Mehrkantausnehmungen (20, 32) eine in den Abmessungen größere Mehrkantaufnahme (25) aufweist, in die das entsprechende Ende (23, 24) der Betätigungswelle (22) drehfest eingesteckt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 3/08; E05C 7/04; E05C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 3/08 (2006.01); E05C 9/02 (2006.01); E05C 7/04 (2006.01); E05C 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/021 (2013.01); E05B 3/08 (2013.01); E05C 7/04 (2013.01); E05C 9/041 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0677631 B1 19980204 - SIEGENIA FRANK KG [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004725 A1 20000531; EP 1004725 B1 20060628; AT 331862 T 20060715; DE 19854589 A1 20000608; DE 19854589 C2 20010208; DE 59913630 D1 20060810

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151111

2016-08-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160729

2016-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 331862 T

- Effective date: 20151111

2015-10-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ROTO FRANK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ROTO FRANK AG, 70771 LEINFELDEN-ECHTERDINGEN, DE

- Document: DE 59913630

2015-09-24 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 59913630

2015-09-24 [REG DE R086] NON-BINDING DECLARATION OF LICENSING INTEREST

- Document: DE 59913630

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141118

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101111

2011-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091126

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20091006

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ROTO FRANK AG

- Free text: ROTO FRANK AG#STUTTGARTER STRASSE 145-149#70771 LEINFELDEN-ECHTERDINGEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- ROTO FRANK AG#STUTTGARTER STRASSE 145-149#70771 LEINFELDEN-ECHTERDINGEN (DE)

2007-06-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070329

2006-12-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-08-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59913630 P 20060810

2006-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2006-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2006-06-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060628

2003-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030723

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001010

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI