Global Patent Index - EP 1004731 A1

EP 1004731 A1 2000-05-31 - Motor vehicle door lock

Title (en)

Motor vehicle door lock

Title (de)

Kraftfahrzeug-Türschloss

Title (fr)

Serrure pour portière de véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 1004731 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402869 A

Priority

FR 9814896 A

Abstract (en)

The lock assembly comprises a twin lever assembly's (20) that are connected to two separate motor drives (26,27). Actuation of the motors such as from a control unit controlled by key operation causes the motors to turn lifting levers and operating the lock mechanism.

Abstract (fr)

Serrure pour portière de véhicule automobile, comportant un boîtier de serrure à au moins deux compartiments, dont un compartiment dit de rétention contient un pêne et un cliquet, et dont un deuxième compartiment dit de cinématique contient une biellette de manoeuvre (11) apte à déplacer le cliquet vers sa position de libération du pêne, un levier d'ouverture intérieure (21) apte à coopérer avec ladite biellette de manoeuvre sous l'action d'un organe de commande intérieure (24), un levier d'ouverture extérieure (20) apte à coopérer avec ladite biellette de manoeuvre sous l'action d'un organe de commande extérieure (26), et un moyen de condamnation/ décondamnation (27, 28, 30, 40), caractérisée par le fait que le levier d'ouverture intérieure (21) est une pièce identique au levier d'ouverture extérieure (20), ladite pièce étant montée dans le boîtier par son recto ou son verso, selon qu'elle est utilisée comme levier d'ouverture intérieure ou comme levier d'ouverture extérieure. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/32; E05B 47/00; E05B 63/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/12 (2006.01); E05B 47/00 (2006.01); E05B 53/00 (2006.01); E05B 63/04 (2006.01); E05B 65/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/06 (2013.01); E05B 79/20 (2013.01); E05B 81/16 (2013.01); E05B 81/64 (2013.01); E05B 81/66 (2013.01); E05B 63/04 (2013.01); E05B 85/01 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004731 A1 20000531; FR 2786522 A1 20000602; FR 2786522 B1 20010608

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RONCIN, JEAN-MICHEL

2003-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DUPONT, PATRICK

2003-03-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DEJEAN, PHILIPPE

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT SE

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI