Global Patent Index - EP 1004732 A1

EP 1004732 A1 2000-05-31 - Espagnolette actuating mechanism

Title (en)

Espagnolette actuating mechanism

Title (de)

Treibstangenverschlussgetriebe

Title (fr)

Mécanisme de commande pour crémone

Publication

EP 1004732 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99440298 A

Priority

FR 9815013 A

Abstract (en)

The control mechanism which rotates in a casing comprises a pinion inverter for controlling movement in opposite directions of operating rods extending on top and underneath the casing. The pinion rotates in the casing about an axis located in the casing plane (7), perpendicularly to the movement of the rods. The pinion ends (13,14), comprising shaft sections (15,16), rotate in bearings (17,18), one of which is in the bottom (20) of the casing. The roller shaped pinion has a length adjusted to the distance separating the bearings whereas its teeth extend over all the length of the roller. The teeth corresponding to the racks (9,10) meshing on the pinion have a width adjusted to the length of teeth on the roller.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un mécanisme de commande de crémone comportant, logé en rotation dans un boîtier (2), un pignon inverseur (3) pour la commande en déplacement dans des directions opposées de deux tringles de manoeuvre (4, 5) s'étendant, respectivement, au-dessus et en-dessous de ce boîtier (2), ledit pignon inverseur (3) d'une part étant monté en rotation dans ce dernier autour d'un axe (6) situé dans le plan (7) de ce boîtier (2), perpendiculairement au déplacement desdites tringles (4, 5) d'autre part comportant ses extrémités (13, 14) montées en rotation des paliers (17, 18) dont l'un (17) est ménagé au niveau du fond (20) du boîtier (2), ce pignon inverseur (3) se présentant sous forme d'un rouleau de longueur ajustée à la distance séparant ces paliers tandis que sa denture (26) s'étend sur toute la longueur dudit rouleau, les dents et/ou échelons (27) correspondant aux crémaillères (9, 10) s'engrénant sur ce pignon présentant une largeur (28 ; 28A) ajustée à cette longueur (32) de la denture (26) de ce dernier. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/041 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004732 A1 20000531

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051124

2004-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040622

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000720

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI