Global Patent Index - EP 1004734 A3

EP 1004734 A3 2001-05-30 - Hinge arrangement

Title (en)

Hinge arrangement

Title (de)

Scharnieranordnung

Title (fr)

Agencement de charnière

Publication

EP 1004734 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99309241 A

Priority

GB 9825445 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2343915A] A hinge arrangement 30 for a double rebate door comprising a first leaf 32, a second leaf 34 pivotably connected by pin 42 and mounting means 36 in the form of a mounting plate 38, studs 40 and slots 41. The first leaf 32 is slidably mounted on the mounting plate 38 via studs 40, within limits set by the abutment of studs 40 with the ends of the slots 41. The leaf 32 also defines channels 43 to receive compression springs 44 which act to move the pivot axis as the door opens so that the door style 48 moves away from the door frame 46. The second leaf 34 comprises a cam 50 to co-operate with a roller 52 in the mounting plate 38 to pull the door style 48 back towards the door frame 46 as the hinge 30 is closed. Alternatively a lever surface (60, figs 7 to 9) and cooperative surface (62, figs 7 to 9) can be used instead of springs 44 or a cam plate (72, figs 10, 11) and pin (74, figs 10,11) can be provided at the top and bottom of the door to replace the springs 44 and cam 50.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 3/02; E05D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 3/02 (2006.01); E05D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 3/022 (2013.01); E05D 11/0027 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/638 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2343915 A 20000524; GB 9825445 D0 19990113; EP 1004734 A2 20000531; EP 1004734 A3 20010530

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011201

2002-03-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI