Global Patent Index - EP 1004736 A2

EP 1004736 A2 2000-05-31 - Vehicle with a body part articulated to the body by at least one hinge

Title (en)

Vehicle with a body part articulated to the body by at least one hinge

Title (de)

Kraftfahrzeug mit einem über mindestens ein Scharnier an der Karosserie angelenkten Karosserieteil

Title (fr)

Véhicule automobile avec pièce de carrosserie articulée à une carrosserie par au moins une charnière

Publication

EP 1004736 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99122980 A

Priority

DE 19854211 A

Abstract (en)

A bodywork part, particularly a tail flap or rear plate, is connected to the bodywork of combination road vehicle by at least one hinge and with at least one pretensioned, spacewise wound bending spring running at a parallel distance from the hinge axis. The bending spring (20) is provided on a first part (7) of the hinge (4). The spring end sections (20', 20) support with tension on the first and second hinge parts (7,8). From the second hinge part (8) and from a first link part (25) a bearing pin (27,28) runs axis-parallel to an accommodation bolt (17) to which is linked a second link part (26).

Abstract (de)

An einem Kombifahrzeug ist eine Heckscheibe (2) über zwei Scharniere (4) angelenkt. Dabei ist am fahrzeugaufbaufesten, zweiten Scharnierteil (8) ein erstes Scharnierteil (7) angelenkt, an dem eine abstandsparallel (Maß c) zur Scharnierachse (b) verlaufende Lagerhülse (15) vorgesehen ist, in der ein Aufnahmebolzen (17) drehbar gelagert ist, welcher eine räumlich gewundene Biegefeder (20) trägt. Deren erster Endabschnitt (20') liegt am Gelenkbolzen (9) mit Vorspannung an, während sich der zweite Endabschnitt (20'') an einem Anlagestift (23) mit Vorspannung abstützt. Ferner ist am Befestigungsabschnitt (17'') des Aufnahmebolzens (17) ein erstes Gelenkteil (25) drehfest angebracht, das an einem seinerseits am zweiten Scharnierteil (8) angelenkten zweiten Gelenkteil (26) schwenkbar gelagert ist. Beim Abwärtsschwenken der Heckscheibe (2) wird die Lagerhülse (15) und damit der Aufnahmebolzen (17) im Winkel von etwa 70 ° um den Scharnierbolzen (9) verschwenkt und bei entsprechender Längserstreckung der Gelenkteile (25 und 26) die Biegefeder (20) bis zum Schließbereich der Heckscheibe (2) stetig höher vorgespannt. Hierdurch steht nach dem Entriegeln der Heckscheibe (2) für deren Hochschwenken anfangs eine sehr hohe Federkraft zur Verfügung, durch die der manuell aufzubringende Kraftaufwand bis zur Horizontalen verhältnismäßig gering ist, wobei schließlich die Heckscheibe (2) bis in den Bereich ihrer größten Offenlage hauptsächlich durch bloße Federkraft verschwenkt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 1/12; B62D 25/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 3/06 (2006.01); E05F 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 3/145 (2013.01); E05F 1/1215 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/546 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 1933220 A1 19710121 - AUDI AG

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004736 A2 20000531; EP 1004736 A3 20020925; DE 19854211 A1 20000531; DE 19854211 B4 20050428

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031119

2003-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030508

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030321

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 05F 1/12 A, 7E 05F 1/10 B, 7B 62D 25/12 B

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI