Global Patent Index - EP 1004739 A2

EP 1004739 A2 2000-05-31 - Insulating disposition for aluminium section members

Title (en)

Insulating disposition for aluminium section members

Title (de)

Isolierverbund für Aluminium-Profile

Title (fr)

Arrangement isolant pour profilés en aluminium

Publication

EP 1004739 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99123414 A

Priority

DE 29821183 U

Abstract (en)

The insulating connection consists of an insulating strip fitting positively to the aluminum strips. In cross section, the insulating strip (20) has a middle sector with a bulge and webs (21) on both side connecting with the strip halves (11, 16). There are nose sectors on both sides of the bulge extending these webs, on which reinforcing strips (25) are fitted.

Abstract (de)

Um einen Isolierverbund für Aluminiumprofile für Fenster, Türen o.dgl. mit äußerer und innerer Profilhälfte (11, 16), die mit einem Isolierprofil (20) zusammengefügt sind, so auszubilden, dass bei erhaltener Isolation und Festigkeit der Rahmenverbindung temperaturunterschiedbedingte zu Ausbiegungen führende Spannungen und Falzundichtheiten vermieden werden, weist das Isolierprofil (20) im Querschnitt einen Mittelabschnitt mit einer Ausbauchung (2) beidseits mit abstehenden, mit den Profilhälften (11, 16) formschlüssig verbindbaren Stegen (21) auf; die Ausbauchung (22) ist beidseits mit diese fortsetzenden Nasen (23) versehen, auf die ein Verstärkungsprofil (25) mit beidseits längsverlaufenden Nuten (27) aufgesetzt ist, die zur Bildung eines Festbereichs (6) die Nasen (23) formschlüssig mit in Querrichtung fester Verbindung aufnehmen, wobei der Scheitel (24) der Ausbauchung des Isolierprofils (20) zur Bildung eines Losebereichs (7) zumindest in einem Teilbereich eine in Längsrichtung verlaufende Auftrennung (24.1) aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/263

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/263 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/26303 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26316 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26358 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26361 (2013.01); E06B 2003/2639 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 29623019 U1 19970828 - SCHUECO INT KG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29821183 U1 20000217; AT 260400 T 20040315; EP 1004739 A2 20000531; EP 1004739 A3 20001115; EP 1004739 B1 20040225; PL 202607 B1 20090731; PL 336782 A1 20000605

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-08-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59908638

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: COHAUSZ & FLORACK PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

2011-06-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SCHOENE, VERA, DR., DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59908638

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110404

2011-05-13 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2011-02-23 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: SD

- Effective date: 20110207

2005-02-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041126

2004-11-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-04-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59908638

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-04-01

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR NL

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030408

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE DE FR NL

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010302

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR NL

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI