Global Patent Index - EP 1004752 A3

EP 1004752 A3 2000-07-19 - Tappet in an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Tappet in an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Ventilstössel für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Poussoir de soupape pour moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1004752 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00104802 A

Priority

EP 96106398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0803641A1] A tappet is used in an internal combustion engine. A cam receiving plate which contacts a cam is brazed on the upper surface of a top wall of a tappet body. The whole surface of the cam receiving plate can act as a cam follower surface, thereby making the outer diameter of the cam receiving plate to the minimum size corresponding to projected length of a nose of a rotary cam and lightening the tappet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/143 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] DE 3239325 A1 19840426 - FELDMUEHLE AG [DE]
  • [A] US 5458097 A 19951017 - DEVINE DOUGLAS L [US], et al
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 157 (M - 696) 13 May 1988 (1988-05-13)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 4 30 April 1996 (1996-04-30)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 9 31 October 1995 (1995-10-31)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0803641 A1 19971029; EP 0803641 B1 20010704; DE 69613673 D1 20010809; DE 69613673 T2 20020516; EP 1004752 A2 20000531; EP 1004752 A3 20000719

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020730

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020319

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001218

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;SI

2000-05-31 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 803641

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;SI