Global patent index - EP 1004755 A2

EP 1004755 A2 2000-05-31 - Production method for rod driven armature in a valve actuator for internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Production method for rod driven armature in a valve actuator for internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Herstellverfahren für einen stösselgeführten Anker eines Aktuators für Hubventile einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Méthode de fabrication d'un induit guidé par poussoir, pour actionneur de soupape de moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1004755 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99121415 A

Priority

DE 19854377 A

Abstract (en)

The production method is for an internal combustion engine lift valve actuator tappet (2) guided anchor (1), where the tappet is connected to the separate anchor of weakly magnetic iron material. The tappet is of a ceramic material with at least one guide section (3) from which a peripheral groove (4) is axially spaced for positioning longitudinally separated cone pieces (5).

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Herstellverfahren für einen stößelgeführen Anker eines Aktuators für Hubventile einer Brennkraftmaschine wird ein Keramik-Stößel mit einem gesondert ausgebildeten Anker aus einem weichmagnetischen Eisenwerkstoff über längsgeteilte Kegelstücke im wesentlichen kraftschlüssig verbunden, wobei die über eine Umfangsnut im Keramik-Stößel positionierten Kegelstücke in eine Press-Sitz-Verbindung mit dem Anker gebracht werden, der zusätzlich mittels einer stoff- oder formschlüssigen Ausbildung an den Kegelstücken lagegesichert ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004755 A2 20000531; EP 1004755 A3 20010509; EP 1004755 B1 20040901; DE 19854377 A1 20000531

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071027

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071027

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051027

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20071027

2006-11-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061128

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061030

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-10-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061027

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-03-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-10-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59910388

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-10-07

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-09-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011019

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI