Global Patent Index - EP 1004755 A3

EP 1004755 A3 2001-05-09 - Production method for rod driven armature in a valve actuator for internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Production method for rod driven armature in a valve actuator for internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Herstellverfahren für einen stösselgeführten Anker eines Aktuators für Hubventile einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Méthode de fabrication d'un induit guidé par poussoir, pour actionneur de soupape de moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1004755 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99121415 A

Priority

DE 19854377 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1004755A2] The production method is for an internal combustion engine lift valve actuator tappet (2) guided anchor (1), where the tappet is connected to the separate anchor of weakly magnetic iron material. The tappet is of a ceramic material with at least one guide section (3) from which a peripheral groove (4) is axially spaced for positioning longitudinally separated cone pieces (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [AP] EP 0922520 A1 19990616 - SIEMENS AUTOMOTIVE CORP LP [US]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 07 31 July 1997 (1997-07-31)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004755 A2 20000531; EP 1004755 A3 20010509; EP 1004755 B1 20040901; DE 19854377 A1 20000531

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071027

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071027

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071027

2006-11-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061128

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061030

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-10-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061027

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-03-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910388 P 20041007

2004-09-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-09-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011019

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI