Global Patent Index - EP 1004773 A1

EP 1004773 A1 2000-05-31 - MULTI-STAGE CAPACITY CONTROL SCROLL COMPRESSOR

Title (en)

MULTI-STAGE CAPACITY CONTROL SCROLL COMPRESSOR

Title (de)

SPIRALVERDICHTER MIT MEHRSTUFIGEM MENGENREGLER

Title (fr)

COMPRESSEUR A VOLUTE DE TYPE A COMMANDE DE CAPACITE EN PLUSIEURS ETAPES

Publication

EP 1004773 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99922489 A

Priority

  • JP 9902761 W
  • JP 16502298 A

Abstract (en)

A first bypass valve (27) that sets discharge capacity to 60% is provided in a first scroll 21 of an asymmetrical spiral-type scroll compressor. Also, a second bypass valve (40) that makes suction side and discharge side communicated with each other so that set load of the compressor becomes 50% is provided outside a scroll of the first scroll (21). In this way, by closing the first and second bypass valves (27, 40), effective load of the compressor is set to 100%. Also, by opening the first bypass valve (27) and concurrently closing the second bypass valve (40), the effective load of the compressor is set to 60%. Further, by opening both the first and second bypass valves (27, 40), the effective load of the compressor is set to 30%. That is, 50% or lower partial load operation with high reliability is performed by setting volume ratio Vr during minimum capacity operation to a value of "1" or more. As a result of this, 50% or lower partial load operation can be changed over in multiple stages. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 18/02; F04C 29/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 18/02 (2006.01); F04C 29/04 (2006.01); F04C 28/16 (2006.01); F04C 28/26 (2006.01); F04C 29/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 28/16 (2013.01); F04C 18/0215 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004773 A1 20000531; EP 1004773 A4 20040512; EP 1004773 B1 20101208; CN 1094566 C 20021120; CN 1272906 A 20001108; DE 69943017 D1 20110120; ES 2356224 T3 20110406; JP 2974009 B1 19991108; JP H11351167 A 19991221; WO 9964744 A1 19991216

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120527

2013-08-20 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130820

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120526

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-03-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69943017

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-03-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120526

2013-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120526

2012-01-05 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 69943017

- Effective date: 20110909

2011-11-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110909

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110523

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110518

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110525

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101208

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110523

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110520

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-04-06 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2356224 T3

- Effective date: 20110406

2011-01-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69943017 P 20110120

2010-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2010-12-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2010-12-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MATSUBA, KENJI

2010-12-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HAGIWARA, SHIGEKI

2010-12-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SHIBAMOTO, YOSHITAKA

2010-12-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KUROIWA, HIROYUKI

2010-06-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F04C 18/02 20060101AFI20100527BHEP

2010-06-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F04C 29/12 20060101ALI20100527BHEP

2004-05-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040325

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 04C 18/02 A

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 04C 29/10 B

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000505

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT