Global patent index - EP 1004776 A2

EP 1004776 A2 2000-05-31 - Process and apparatus for avoiding cavitation in a pump conveying saturated water

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for avoiding cavitation in a pump conveying saturated water

Title (de)

Verfahren und Anlage zur Vermeidung von Kavitation in einer Sattwasser fördernden Pumpe

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour éviter la cavitation dans une pompe pour eau saturée

Publication

EP 1004776 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99811083 A

Priority

DE 19854383 A

Abstract (en)

A procedure for avoiding cavitation in a pump which communicates on the suction side with a saturated water source, has actual values of pressure and/or temperature of the saturated water detected in at least the saturated water source (1) and compared with established values of pressure and/or temperature that favor cavitation in the pump (5). In the case that the actual values attain the established values, mixing water is supplied to the pump on the suction side with a temperature lower than the established temperature value. After a change of the actual values determined as not permissible, an established unchangeable amount of flow of the mixing water is supplied until the actual values lie again in a range favoring no cavitation.

Abstract (de)

Ein Behälter (1) mit Sattwasser (2) ist über eine Saugleitung (4) mit einer Pumpe (5) verbunden. Die Ist-Werte von Druck und/oder Temperatur im Behälter (1) werden durch eine Messeinrichtung (7) erfasst und einem Steuergerät (8) zugeführt, in welchem die Ist-Werte mit festgelegten Werten verglichen werden. In einem Wasserreservoir (9) ist Zumischwasser vorhanden, dessen Temperatur tiefer als die Ist-Temperatur im Behälter (1) ist. Dieses Wasserreservoir (9) steht über eine Zulaufleitung (11) mit der Saugleitung (4) in Verbindung. In der Zulaufleitung (11) ist ein Stellglied (12) angeordnet, das vom Steuergerät (8) angesteuert wird. Wenn die Ist-Werte im Behälter (1) die festgelegten Werte erreichen, so dass die Pumpe (5) kavitieren könnte, wird das Stellglied (12) durch das Steuergerät (8) geöffnet, um Zumischwasser in die Saugleitung (4) einzubringen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/669 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004776 A2 20000531; EP 1004776 A3 20010418; DE 19854383 A1 20000531; US 2002034445 A1 20020321; US 6398510 B1 20020604

INPADOC legal status

2006-07-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060131

2004-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE GB

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010903

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 04D 29/66 A, 7F 04D 15/02 B

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI