Global Patent Index - EP 1004777 A2

EP 1004777 A2 2000-05-31 - Jet pump

Title (en)

Jet pump

Title (de)

Saugstrahlpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe à jet

Publication

EP 1004777 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99123142 A

Priority

DE 19855433 A

Abstract (en)

A drive jet nozzle (5) produces a drive jet in a suction jet pump, the jet being received by a diffusor (9). A mixture tube (8) is also incorporated. The produced drive jet enters the diffusor and closes it over its entire periphery. The nozzle aperture (6) of the drive jet nozzle is formed to produce a flat jet. It has a crossways running notch (7) and is formed by several openings arranged in a line. The diffusor is elliptical and the axis of the drive jet nozzle is arranged at an angle to that of the mixture tube. The diffusor is circular. The suction jet pump has sprung securing hooks (13) for rapid installation.

Abstract (de)

Bekannte Saugstrahlpumpen zum Fördern von Kraftstoff innerhalb eines Kraftstoffbehälters von Kraftfahrzeugen fördern diesen aus entfernt oder tiefer liegenden Bereichen des Kraftstoffbehälters zur Fördereinheit oder in einen Schwalltopf. Für einen guten Wirkungsgrad der Saugstrahlpumpe ist die Länge des Mischrohres entscheidend, die ca. das 10-fache des Mischrohrdurchmessers betragen soll. Aufgrund der räumlichen Gegebenheiten in einem Kraftstoffbehälter sind diese geometrischen Anforderungen oft nicht realisierbar. Die neue Saugstrahlpumpe soll eine verbesserte Saugwirkung besitzen, einfach gebaut sein und keinen großen Bauraum beanspruchen. Die Saugstrahldüse und der Diffusor sind derart ausgebildet, daß der erzeugte Treibstrahl sich bereits im Diffusor vollständig an den Umfang des Diffusors anlegt und diesen verschließt. Durch den auf diese Weise erzeugten hohen Unterdruck wird eine verbesserte Saugwirkung erzielt. Die Saugstrahlpumpe eignet sich insbesondere für den Einsatz in Kraftstoftbehältern von Kraftfahrzeugen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04F 5/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/00 (2006.01); F04F 5/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04F 5/463 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004777 A2 20000531; EP 1004777 A3 20001213; EP 1004777 B1 20050831; DE 19855433 A1 20000608; DE 19855433 B4 20051006; DE 59912494 D1 20051006; KR 100687953 B1 20070227; KR 20000035722 A 20000626; US 6296454 B1 20011002

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151130

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-06-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091119

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20091119

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081117

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-08-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060601

2006-05-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-10-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050921

2005-10-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59912494

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-10-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-08-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2005-08-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040810

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB SE

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001106

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 04F 5/46 A, 7F 04F 5/42 B

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI