Global patent index - EP 1004815 A2

EP 1004815 A2 2000-05-31 - Signalling apparatus

Title (en)

Signalling apparatus

Title (de)

Signaleinrichtung

Title (fr)

Appareil de signalisation

Publication

EP 1004815 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 99402939 A

Priority

DE 19854669 A

Abstract (en)

The system comprises a mounting joint (27) that is mounted to the electrical system or machinery. Each optical/audio system (2) is mounted to the joint and comprises similar joints at the other disconnected end. This enables either or both system to be employed.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un appareil de signalisation, en particulier pour la signalisation de différents états de service et/ou de défaillance pour des machines électriques, de préférence des machines automatiques, comprenant plusieurs, au moins deux transmetteurs de signal optique et/ou acoustique (2), qui sont disposés de façon sensiblement linéaire, juxtaposés et/ou superposés et sont reliés par des lignes d'énergie à une source d'énergie, les transmetteurs de signal (2) présentant chacun un boîtier (3) dans lequel sont disposés des récepteurs électriques pour générer un signal optique et/ou acoustique, par exemple des lampes (43), des boîtiers (3) disposés à côté étant reliés entre eux par un élément d'accouplement (27). Pour créer un tel appareil de signalisation, qui est de conception simple au niveau de la construction et peut être monté pour l'essentiel sans raccords vissés, ce qui permet de réaliser de préférence des activités simplifiées de maintenance et d'extension, en particulier en ce qui concerne le remplacement de lampes défectueuses et/ou d'autres composants électriques et/ou électroniques, sans qu'il soit nécessaire d'effectuer un démontage pratiquement complet, il est prévu que l'élément d'accouplement (27) est conçu comme une bague, qui présente sur sa surface intérieure (29) voisine et tournée vers les boîtiers (3) à coupler entre eux au moins un premier évidement allant dans le sens périphérique, qui a sur son extrémité une ouverture d'arrêt pour loger un élément de verrouillage disposé de façon élastique sur le premier boîtier (3), que l'élément d'accouplement (27) est fixé de façon pivotante sur le premier boîtier (3) et que l'élément d'accouplement (27) a au moins des évidements du type baïonnette, dans lesquels s'engage une saillie correspondante du deuxième boîtier (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/00 (2006.01); F21V 17/14 (2006.01); F21V 17/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 17/164 (2013.01); F21S 8/00 (2013.01); F21V 17/14 (2013.01); F21W 2111/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004815 A2 20000531; EP 1004815 A3 20011004; EP 1004815 B1 20030827; DE 19854669 A1 20000608; DE 19854669 C2 20010628

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151125

2016-08-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160729

2016-07-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151125

2016-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20151125

2016-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141113

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141010

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141118

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141114

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-08-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040528

2003-12-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031119

2003-08-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH FR GB IT LI

2003-08-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-08-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRONIC INDUSTRIES SAS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-08-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-06-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH FR GB IT LI

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020314

2001-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 21S 8/00 A, 7G 08B 5/36 B, 7F 21W 111:00 Z

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991229

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH FR GB IT LI

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI