Global Patent Index - EP 1004816 A1

EP 1004816 A1 2000-05-31 - Luminaire with internal supporting plate which can be mounted on one of two different levels

Title (en)

Luminaire with internal supporting plate which can be mounted on one of two different levels

Title (de)

Leuchte mit einer inneren Trägerplatte, die auf einer der zwei verschiedenen Höhen aufgestellt werden kann

Title (fr)

Luminaire, à platine interne susceptible d'être disposée à l'un ou l'autre de deux niveaux différents

Publication

EP 1004816 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402863 A

Priority

FR 9814821 A

Abstract (en)

The light comprises a base unit (11) and a lock plate (13) that supports the base (12) within the base unit. Adjustment means (15A,15B) enable the position of the support plate to be maintained.

Abstract (fr)

Il s'agit d'un luminaire du genre comportant un socle (11), qui présente un fond (12), et une platine (13), qui, pour le support de divers constituants, intervient à distance de ce fond (12), le socle (11) comportant, pour le maintien de cette platine (13), des moyens d'assujettissement (15A, 15B) propres à un tel maintien. Suivant l'invention, le socle (11) comporte des moyens d'assujettissement (15A, 15B) à deux niveaux différents par rapport à son fond (12). Application, notamment, aux hublots. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/04; F21V 15/01; F21V 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/02 (2006.01); F21V 15/00 (2006.01); F21V 15/01 (2006.01); F21V 19/00 (2006.01); F21V 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/02 (2013.01); F21V 15/01 (2013.01); F21V 23/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004816 A1 20000531; EP 1004816 B1 20020807; DE 69902431 D1 20020912; DE 69902431 T2 20021212; FR 2786255 A1 20000526; FR 2786255 B1 20010427

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051118

2006-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060601

2005-11-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051118

2005-11-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051118

2004-11-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041109

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-11-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041105

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-07-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030508

2002-09-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020830

2002-09-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69902431 20020912

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2002-08-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010612

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB IT

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000706

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI