Global Patent Index - EP 1004822 B1

EP 1004822 B1 2002-11-13 - Sliding grate assembly for a solid fuel boiler or a similar installation

Title (en)

Sliding grate assembly for a solid fuel boiler or a similar installation

Title (de)

Schubrostanordnung für einen Festbrennstoff-Kessel o. dgl.

Title (fr)

Agencement de grille poussante pour une chaudière à combustible solide ou pour une installation similaire

Publication

EP 1004822 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99115440 A

Priority

DE 19851085 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19851085A1] A stepped grate (30) in a solid fuel boiler, combustion furnace or burner works with a rigid grate unit (3) and a movable grate unit (4), lowering in stages from the fuel intake (31) to the ash removal point (32). For a horizontal lift movement backwards and forwards the movable grate unit (4) is arranged on the rigid grate unit (3) or on a common baseplate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23H 7/08; F23B 1/20; F23L 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23H 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23H 7/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19851085 A1 20000511; AT 227826 T 20021115; EP 1004822 A1 20000531; EP 1004822 B1 20021113

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170301

2017-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160805

2017-04-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160831

2017-04-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160831

2017-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 227826 T

- Effective date: 20160805

2017-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59903388

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151030

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150827

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150824

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903388 20021219

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2002-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227826 T 20021115

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE LI

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000711

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI