Global Patent Index - EP 1004823 A2

EP 1004823 A2 2000-05-31 - Damping device for the reduction of the oscillation amplitude of acoustic waves for a burner

Title (en)

Damping device for the reduction of the oscillation amplitude of acoustic waves for a burner

Title (de)

Dämpfungsvorrichtung zur Reduzierung der Schwingungsamplitude akustischer Wellen für einen Brenner

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'amortissement pour la réduction de l'amplitude d'oscillation d'ondes acoustiques pour un brûleur

Publication

EP 1004823 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99810950 A

Priority

DE 19851636 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19851636A1] Preferably for driving a gas turbo-group, the internal combustion engine burner incorporates a damping device for reduction of the vibration amplitude of acoustic waves. A mixture area (2) is provided for air and fuel and a combustion chamber (1) is arranged beyond the mixture area in which the fuel-air mixture is ignited. A Helmholz resonator (4) is directly connected with the mixture area. The acoustic waves formed in the burner are suppressed in the resonator and are not reflected back into the burner. The resonator is arranged in the flow direction of the fuel-air mixture before the mixture area.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird eine Dämpfungsvorrichtung zur Reduzierung der Schwingungsamplitude akustischer Wellen für einen Brenner zum Betrieb einer Brennkraftmaschine, vorzugsweise zum Antrieb einer Gasturbogruppe, mit einem Mischbereich, in dem eine Luft- und Brennstoffströmung zu einem Brennstoff-/Luft-Gemisch miteinander vermischt werden, und einer Brennkammer, die in Strömungsrichtung des Brennstoff-/Luft-Gemisch dem Mischbereich nachgeordnet ist, in der das Brennstoff-/Luft-Gemisch entzündbar ist. Die Erfindung zeichnet sich dadurch aus, daß ein Helmholtz-Resonator (4) derart unmittelbar mit dem Mischbereich (2) des Brenners verbunden ist, daß die sich im Brenner ausbildenden akustischen Wellen im Helmholtz-Resonator unterdrückt und nicht in den Brenner zurückreflektiert werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23M 13/00; F23D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/18 (2006.01); F23D 14/46 (2006.01); F23R 3/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/46 (2013.01); F23R 3/286 (2013.01); F05B 2260/96 (2013.01); F23C 2900/07002 (2013.01); F23D 2210/00 (2013.01); F23R 2900/00014 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0321809 A1 19890628 - BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19851636 A1 20000511; CN 1151344 C 20040526; CN 1257179 A 20000621; EP 1004823 A2 20000531; EP 1004823 A3 20001129; EP 1004823 B1 20030820; JP 2000146182 A 20000526; JP 4511658 B2 20100728; US 6370879 B1 20020416

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-08-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59906664

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121020

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130628

2013-06-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20121020

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110930

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111005

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101029

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-08-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040524

2004-05-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-12-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031110

2003-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59906664

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-09-25

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-08-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-08-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020715

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010402

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI