Global Patent Index - EP 1004829 A1

EP 1004829 A1 2000-05-31 - Fabric with helical support

Title (en)

Fabric with helical support

Title (de)

Gewebe mit Stützvorrichtung in Form einer Schraubenfeder

Title (fr)

Tissu avec un support hélicoidal

Publication

EP 1004829 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99309484 A

Priority

  • GB 9826092 A
  • GB 9903815 A

Abstract (en)

There is disclosed a fluid delivery device (1, 1a) having an inlet for fluid (2) and two sheets of woven, knitted or non-woven fibres arranged as a double layer. The double layer comprises one or more fluid delivery regions (4, 4a) in which the sheets are held apart by a helical support (6, 6a) to define an internal cavity within the double layer. The device (1, 1a) is arranged such that, in use, fluid from the inlet (2, 2a) passes into the regions (4, 4a) and permeates out of the device through one or both of the sheets. Also disclosed is a fabric comprising two sheets as a double layer. The double layer comprises a plurality of regions in which the sheets are held apart by a helical support to define an internal cavity within the double layer. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 13/068; A61G 7/057

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 7/057 (2006.01); F24F 13/068 (2006.01); F24F 13/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/0218 (2013.01); A61G 7/0573 (2013.01); A61G 7/05769 (2013.01); A61G 7/05784 (2016.11); F24F 13/068 (2013.01); F24F 2013/0608 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004829 A1 20000531; EP 1004829 B1 20041006; AT 278917 T 20041015; DE 69920849 D1 20041111; DE 69920849 T2 20050210

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161117

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-09-28 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: HEATHCOAT FABRICS LIMITED

- Effective date: 20120829

2012-09-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HEATHCOAT FABRICS LTD., US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: JOHN HEATHCOAT & CO. LTD., TIVERTON, GB

- Document: DE 69920849

- Effective date: 20120802

2012-09-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HEATHCOAT FABRICS LTD., TIVERTON, GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: JOHN HEATHCOAT & CO. LTD., TIVERTON, DEVON, GB

- Document: DE 69920849

- Effective date: 20120802

2012-09-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HEATHCOAT FABRICS LTD., TIVERTON, GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HEATHCOAT FABRICS LTD., TIVERTON, DEVON, GB

- Document: DE 69920849

- Effective date: 20120927

2012-09-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69920849

- Representative's name: LEDERER & KELLER, DE

- Effective date: 20120802

2012-09-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69920849

- Representative's name: LEDERER & KELLER PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT , DE

- Effective date: 20120927

2012-09-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69920849

- Representative's name: LEDERER & KELLER PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT , DE

- Effective date: 20120802

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050306

2006-04-05 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-09-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050707

2005-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-04-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-01-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050117

2005-01-06 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050106

2005-01-06 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050106

2004-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-26 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041126

2004-11-26 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041126

2004-11-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69920849 P 20041111

2004-11-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-10-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-10-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041006

2004-10-06 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041006

2004-10-06 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041006

2004-10-06 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041006

2004-10-06 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041006

2004-10-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041006

2004-10-06 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041006

2004-10-06 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041006

2004-10-06 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041006

2003-10-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030910

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001107

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI