Global Patent Index - EP 1004833 A3

EP 1004833 A3 2002-09-11 - Heater

Title (en)

Heater

Title (de)

Heizkessel

Title (fr)

Chaudière

Publication

EP 1004833 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99123584 A

Priority

DE 19854910 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1004833A2] In an upright heating boiler (1) fluid or gas-form fuel is burnt, using a top face side-burner (2), the flame of which is conducted into an open chamber (3) in a spreading direction. The open chamber is surrounded by a water chamber (4) and downstream issues into a deflection chamber (5) connected with a flue gas collection chamber (21) via a channel structure (6). The water chamber is divided into inner (9) and outer (10) areas by a vertical dividing wall (8), allowing a water access (11) into the lower section (12) of the water chamber and a throttled access (14) to the upper section (13) of the chamber.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 1/28; F24H 9/00; F24H 9/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 1/28 (2006.01); F24H 9/00 (2006.01); F24H 9/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/0015 (2013.01); F24H 1/285 (2013.01); F24H 9/0036 (2013.01); F24H 9/122 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004833 A2 20000531; EP 1004833 A3 20020911; DE 19854910 A1 20000608; DE 19854910 B4 20040902

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041123

2003-10-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030911

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020830

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LITFIN, DIETHARD

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WIRTH, CHRISTOPH

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI