Global Patent Index - EP 1004841 A2

EP 1004841 A2 2000-05-31 - Heat exchanger tank

Title (en)

Heat exchanger tank

Title (de)

Wasserkasten für Wärmetauscher

Title (fr)

Boîte collectrice pour échangeur de chaleur

Publication

EP 1004841 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99123593 A

Priority

  • JP 33712798 A
  • JP 35868498 A
  • JP 30348499 A

Abstract (en)

A tank of heat exchanger (100) comprises a tank body (102) and a pipe member (106). The tank body (108) is made of clad metal and shaped like a channel member with a base wall (102c) and two opposed side walls (102a,b). The pipe member (106) is first spot welded with its flance (110) to the tank body (102) and then finally brazed in a furnace. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28F 9/00 (2006.01); F28F 9/02 (2006.01); F28F 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 9/002 (2013.01); F28F 9/0224 (2013.01); F28F 9/0246 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP S602195 A 19850108 - PERSTORP AB

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004841 A2 20000531; EP 1004841 A3 20000913; EP 1004841 B1 20030709; DE 69909408 D1 20030814; DE 69909408 T2 20040519

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050729

2005-07-13 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041126

2005-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050601

2004-11-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041126

2004-06-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-05-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031223

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-11-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031120

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-10-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031027

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69909408 P 20030814

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-07-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020529

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-01-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CALSONIC KANSEI CORPORATION

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991126

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI