Global Patent Index - EP 1004843 A1

EP 1004843 A1 2000-05-31 - Device for controlling the velocity of return into battery of an artillery gun in function of the temperature

Title (en)

Device for controlling the velocity of return into battery of an artillery gun in function of the temperature

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zu einer temperaturabhängigen Steuerung der Vorlaufgeschwindigkeit eines Geschützes

Title (fr)

Dispositif de régulation de la vitesse de rentrée en batterie d'un canon d'artillerie en fonction de la température

Publication

EP 1004843 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402752 A

Priority

FR 9814929 A

Abstract (en)

The recoil velocity regulator consists of a shock buffer (13) interacting with a ring (14) to provide progressive braking at the end of recoil by means of oil flowing through the gap between the two. It also has a modulator (17) incorporating a thermosensory element made from an alloy with a shape memory effect which increases the oil flow when the temperature drops below a set level. The thermosensory element can be formed by the ring itself or the buffer, and the latter can have an additional oil flow passage (30) with its section controlled by the modulator.

Abstract (fr)

Le secteur technique de l'invention est celui des dispositifs de régulation de la vitesse de rentrée en batterie d'un canon d'artillerie en fonction de la température. Le dispositif de régulation selon l'invention comprend un tampon de choc (13) coopérant avec une bague (14), de façon à assurer un freinage progressif du canon en fin de rentrée en batterie par laminage de l'huile au travers d'une section de fuite (15) située entre le tampon et la bague. Il est caractérisé en ce qu'il comporte au moins un dispositif de modulation (17) comprenant un élément thermosensible réalisé dans un alliage à mémoire de forme, élément assurant par sa déformation, un accroissement de la section de fuite lorsque la température descend sous un seuil donné. Application aux liens élastiques de canons d'artilleries. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 25/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 25/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 25/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1004843 A1 20000531; EP 1004843 B1 20030212; DE 69905330 D1 20030320; DE 69905330 T2 20030918; FR 2786260 A1 20000526; FR 2786260 B1 20001229; US 6227097 B1 20010508

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071105

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051026

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061105

2007-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061105

2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051027

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-10-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051026

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-02-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69905330 P 20030320

2003-03-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030212

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2003-02-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020531

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB IT

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000904

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI